Lim v. BSI Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Neang Peou Lim
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and BSI Financial Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv10769
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Complaint challenges defendant mortgage servicer's right to foreclose on the property located 200 Trotting Park Road, Lowell, Massachusetts on two grounds: first, that the servicer executed and recorded an affidavit on behalf of the mortgagee without a proper power of attorney; and second, the notice to cure received by plaintiff was defective because it "inaccurately refers to Plaintiff's payments as due monthly when they are actually due bi-weekly." Compl. para. 21. Defendant's motion to dismiss points out that the power of attorney was in fact recorded three months prior to the affidavit. See Def's Exs. 3 & 4 (dkt # 9-3, 9-4); see also Alternative Energy, Inc. v. St. Paul Fire & Marine Ins. Co. , 267 F.3d 30, 33 (1st Cir. 2001) (court may consider public records on a motion to dismiss). Further, the mistatement of the payment period does not render a notice to cure defective. See Mass. Gen. Laws ch. 244, s 35A(c). The plaintiff having also failed to oppose the motion to dismiss, it is ALLOWED. The Clerk will enter an order of dismissal and close this case. (Tang, Danni)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service by Aaron A. Fredericks on behalf of BSI Financial Services, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Fredericks, Aaron)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BSI Financial Services, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Certificate of Service)(Fredericks, Aaron)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BSI Financial Services, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fredericks, Aaron)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED STATE COURT Record. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 17, 2019 to plead, move or otherwise respond to Complaint. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 17, 2019 to plead, move or otherwise respond to Complaint with Certificate of Service by BSI Financial Services, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Fredericks, Aaron)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Demerle on behalf of BSI Financial Services, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Demerle, Richard)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Caruso, Stephanie)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BSI Financial Services, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trust not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for Brougham Fund II Trust ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7644562 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form, #4 Certificate of Service)(Fredericks, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lim v. BSI Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neang Peou Lim
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Richard C. Demerle
Represented By: Aaron A. Fredericks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI Financial Services
Represented By: Richard C. Demerle
Represented By: Aaron A. Fredericks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?