In Re. Laudani et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Laudani
Defendant: Manhattan Financial Services, Inc., Robert J. Walsh and Mary Ann Walsh
Case Number: 1:2019cv10932
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 8, 2019 to File Objections, with certificate of conference, filed by Nicholas Laudani.(Baker, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #9 Motion for Leave to File Late Statement of Objections to Report and Recommendations without prejudice for failure to certify compliance with Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) by conferring with opposing counsel and indicating to the court whether the motion for leave to file will be opposed. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 27, 2019 to File Objections , with certificate of service, filed by Nicholas Laudani.(Baker, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT (Trial Transcript) by Nicholas Laudani. (Baker, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT (Bankruptcy Court Record) by Nicholas Laudani. (Baker, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Nicholas Laudani re 5 Order,,,,, (Baker, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9033(b), objections to the bankruptcy courts proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are to be filed [w]ithin 14 days after being served with a copy of the proposed findings or conclusions objected to and state the grounds for such objection. Additionally, [a] party objecting to the bankruptcy judges proposed findings or conclusions shall arrange promptly for the transcription of the record. Id. Requests for extensions of time to file objections are to be filed with the bankruptcy judge. Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9033(c); see also Hunt v. Parkway Trans., Inc., 254 B.R. 561, 564-65 (W.D. Tex. 2001) (comparing rules for district court review of magistrate judges report and recommendation and bankruptcy judges proposed findings and conclusions and concluding that pursuant to bankruptcy rules, only a bankruptcy judge can grant an extension of time for filing objections). As no objections appear to have been filed, this court takes the bankruptcy courts proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law under advisement. Following de novo review, the scope of which is necessarily limited by the absence of a record beyond the bankruptcy courts proposal, this court will issue its order. (Rivera, Christina)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Letter/request (non-motion) from David Baker, Esq., on behalf of Nicholas Laudarni , with certificate of service.. (Baker, David)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-01148. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Laudani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Walsh
Represented By: Adam T Dupuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Walsh
Represented By: Adam T Dupuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Laudani
Represented By: David G. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?