Wainblat v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Wainblat
Defendant: Does 1 - 50 and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10976
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Meredith C. Slawe. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael W. McTigue Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay Litigation by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Arbitration Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Patel Declaration)(Parachini, Alexander)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Meredith C. Slawe Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7747460 by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Parachini, Alexander)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael W. McTigue Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7747446 by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Parachini, Alexander)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Parachini on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC (Parachini, Alexander)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Levitt on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC (Levitt, Peter)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominic Valerian on behalf of Robert Wainblat (Valerian, Dominic)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ray E. Gallo on behalf of Robert Wainblat (Gallo, Ray)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Slade on behalf of Robert Wainblat (Slade, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Bates, III on behalf of Robert Wainblat (Bates, Joseph)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Dominic Valerian. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ray E. Gallo. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph Henry Bates. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David F. Slade. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Domini Valerian Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7661006 by Robert Wainblat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newberg, Kenneth)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ray E. Gallo Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7660990 by Robert Wainblat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newberg, Kenneth)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph Henry "Hank" Bates Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7659950 by Robert Wainblat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newberg, Kenneth)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Slade Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7659805 by Robert Wainblat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newberg, Kenneth)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Wainblat. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Newberg, Kenneth)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7654784 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Wainblat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet)(Newberg, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wainblat v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wainblat
Represented By: Kenneth A. Newberg
Represented By: Ray E. Gallo
Represented By: Dominic Valerian
Represented By: David F. Slade
Represented By: Joseph H. Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Peter K. Levitt
Represented By: Meredith C. Slawe
Represented By: Michael W. McTigue, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander K. Parachini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?