T-Mobile Northeast LLC v. The Town of Barnstable et al
Plaintiff: T-Mobile Northeast LLC
Defendant: Mary Barry, Walter Watson, Alex Rodolakis, Mark Hansen, The Town of Barnstable Zoning Board of Appeals, The Town of Barnstable, Paul Pinard, Jeffrey Swartz, Steven Costello, Patrick Foran, Fred Laselva, Todd Walantis, Herbert Bodensiek and The Town of Barnstable Planning Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv10982
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Curran, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 Filing 30 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Curran, Patrick)
June 3, 2019 Filing 29 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 31, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to July 11 through July 17, 2019 by Mary Barry, Herbert Bodensiek, Steven Costello, Patrick Foran, Mark Hansen, Fred Laselva, Paul Pinard, Alex Rodolakis, Jeffrey Swartz, The Town of Barnstable, The Town of Barnstable Planning Board, The Town of Barnstable Zoning Board of Appeals, Todd Walantis, Walter Watson.(Houghton, T.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added T. Scott Thompson and Patrick J. Curran Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of T. Scott Thompson and Patrick J. Curran Jr. Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7701310 by T-Mobile Northeast LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of T. Scott Thompson, #2 Affidavit Patrick J. Curran, Jr.)(Worth, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mary Barry, Herbert Bodensiek, Steven Costello, Patrick Foran, Mark Hansen, Fred Laselva, Paul Pinard, Alex Rodolakis, Jeffrey Swartz, The Town of Barnstable, The Town of Barnstable Planning Board, The Town of Barnstable Zoning Board of Appeals, Todd Walantis, Walter Watson.(Houghton, T.)
May 9, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed Patrick Foran served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fred Laselva served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alex Rodolakis served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Herbert Bodensiek served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Paul Pinard served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Todd Walantis served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Hansen served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Walter Watson served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Steven Costello served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeffrey Swartz served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mary Barry served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Town of Barnstable served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Town of Barnstable Planning Board served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Town of Barnstable Zoning Board of Appeals served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Worth, William)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Worth on behalf of T-Mobile Northeast LLC (Worth, William)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T-Mobile Northeast LLC identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG for T-Mobile Northeast LLC.. (Romasco, Caitlin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Expedited Treatment against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7655927 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by T-Mobile Northeast LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet)(Romasco, Caitlin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Mobile Northeast LLC v. The Town of Barnstable et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Barry
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Watson
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Rodolakis
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hansen
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Barnstable Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Barnstable
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pinard
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Swartz
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Costello
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Foran
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Laselva
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Walantis
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Bodensiek
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Barnstable Planning Board
Represented By: T. David Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Mobile Northeast LLC
Represented By: Caitlin A. Romasco
Represented By: William A. Worth
Represented By: Patrick J. Curran, Jr.
Represented By: T. Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?