Reasonover v. Local Advantage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Casey Reasonover
Defendant: Local Advantage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10985
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered granting #10 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Entry of Final Judgment. (Paine, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Entry of Final Judgment by Casey Reasonover. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Paronich, Anthony)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 On Monday May 20, 2019, the Court Received a Pleading Answer and New Matter of Defendant to Complaint from Local Advantage, Inc. The Pleading Was ONLY Received by the Court As A Corporation Cannot Proceed Pro Se and Must Be Represented By Counsel. (Paine, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Paine, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Local Advantage, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Request for notice of default by Casey Reasonover . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Pro Se Answer)(Paronich, Anthony)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Local Advantage, Inc. served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Paronich, Anthony)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Washkowitz on behalf of Casey Reasonover (Washkowitz, Alex)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Local Advantage, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local Advantage, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7656369 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Casey Reasonover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Form)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reasonover v. Local Advantage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Reasonover
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Alex M. Washkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Advantage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?