Shealey vs Banker's Standard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Glenn E. Shealey
Defendant: Banker's Standard Insurance Company and Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11008
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 7/10/2019 (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 10, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Glenn E. Shealey.(Deptula, George)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Banker's Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Varga, Gregory)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Banker's Standard Insurance Company.(Varga, Gregory)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 5/20/2019 (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Banker's Standard Insurance Company.(Varga, Gregory)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Lara, Miguel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Banker's Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Banker's Standard Insurance Company.. (Varga, Gregory)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Lara, Miguel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Varga on behalf of Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Banker's Standard Insurance Company (Varga, Gregory)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Banker's Standard Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7660113 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45)(Varga, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shealey vs Banker's Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banker's Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory P. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory P. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn E. Shealey
Represented By: George C. Deptula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?