City of Somerville v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Plaintiff: City of Somerville
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt plc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Jane Does 1-50, Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Walgreens Boot Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Insys Therapeutics, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SPECGX LLC and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11009
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and assigned civil case number 1:19-op-45319. (Danieli, Chris)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 Case Electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 5/10/19. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-91 in MDL Case 2804 received from District of District of Ohio (Northern) requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 91 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time for defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt, LLC and SPECGX LLC to respond to the Complaint until 30 days after a court rules on any motion to remand that Plaintiff may file or a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer, whichever is later. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time (Defendants' Assented-To Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond) by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX LLC.(O'Connor, Brien)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew O'Connor on behalf of Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX LLC (O'Connor, Andrew)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin R. Macgowan on behalf of Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX LLC (Macgowan, Erin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Lara, Miguel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt plc for Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (O'Connor, Brien)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX LLC. (O'Connor, Brien)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7659961 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Connor, Brien)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Somerville v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew O'Connor
Represented By: Erin R. Macgowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Represented By: Andrew O'Connor
Represented By: Erin R. Macgowan
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew O'Connor
Represented By: Erin R. Macgowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boot Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew O'Connor
Represented By: Erin R. Macgowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Somerville
Represented By: Linda Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?