Dyer v. Veterans Affairs, United States Department of
Plaintiff: Veronica Dyer
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2019cv11025
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs.(Poswistilo, Susan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Poswistilo on behalf of U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs (Poswistilo, Susan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Veronica Dyer. Veronica Dyer served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Veronica Dyer. (Long, Mickey)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7664338 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Veronica Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-FOIA Request, #3 Exhibit B-VA Response, #4 Exhibit C-FOIA Appeal, #5 Exhibit D-VA Confirmation)(Long, Mickey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer v. Veterans Affairs, United States Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Dyer
Represented By: Mickey Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?