Lee v. Town of Dartmouth et al
Plaintiff: Timothy M Lee
Defendant: Town of Dartmouth, Gregory W Barnes, Frank S Gracie, III, Dartmouth Select Board, John P Haran, John Does 1-10, XYZ Corporations 1-10 and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv11036
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/02/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Timothy M Lee.(Brainsky, Eric)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Urso, Lisa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 10, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Timothy M Lee.(Levinson, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gregory W Barnes, Dartmouth Select Board, Town of Dartmouth. (Adukonis, Nora)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gregory W Barnes, Dartmouth Select Board, Town of Dartmouth.(Adukonis, Nora)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Frank S Gracie, III. (Adukonis, Nora)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Frank S Gracie, III.(Adukonis, Nora)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Urso, Lisa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 10, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Timothy M Lee.(Levinson, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gareth W. Notis on behalf of John P Haran. (Notis, Gareth)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John P Haran. (Notis, Gareth)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John P Haran.(Notis, Gareth)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold) (Pacho, Arnold).
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Gregory W Barnes, Dartmouth Select Board, Frank S Gracie, III, Town of Dartmouth. (Adukonis, Nora) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2019: #1 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold).
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gregory W Barnes, Dartmouth Select Board, Frank S Gracie, III, Town of Dartmouth ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7666870 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Adukonis, Nora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Town of Dartmouth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Dartmouth
Represented By: Nora R. Adukonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W Barnes
Represented By: Nora R. Adukonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank S Gracie, III
Represented By: Nora R. Adukonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dartmouth Select Board
Represented By: Nora R. Adukonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Haran
Represented By: Gareth W. Notis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy M Lee
Represented By: Eric S. Brainsky
Represented By: Michael E. Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?