Allscripts Healthcare, LLC v. DR/Decision Resources, LLC
Plaintiff: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC
Defendant: DR/Decision Resources, LLC d/b/a Decision Resources Group and DR/Decision Resources, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Case Number: 1:2019cv11038
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 117 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 115 by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silberfarb, Michael)
March 25, 2020 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by DR/Decision Resources, LLC and by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
March 23, 2020 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #108 MOTION for Protective Order with Respect to Proposed Disclosure to Sven Junkergard filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Silberfarb, Michael)
March 23, 2020 Filing 114 STIPULATION by DR/Decision Resources, LLC and by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Nadel, Michael)
March 20, 2020 Filing 113 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #112 Motion to Seal Document (Russo, Noreen)
March 17, 2020 Filing 112 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #111 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
March 17, 2020 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #102 Cross MOTION to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E)(Nadel, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 110 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION #108 MOTION for Protective Order with Respect to Proposed Disclosure to Sven Junkergard filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC to Magistrate Judge Cabell(Vieira, Leonardo) Motion referred to Donald L. Cabell.
March 9, 2020 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM in Support re #108 MOTION for Protective Order with Respect to Proposed Disclosure to Sven Junkergard filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Nadel, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 108 MOTION for Protective Order with Respect to Proposed Disclosure to Sven Junkergard by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
March 5, 2020 Filing 107 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC.(Nadel, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Filing 106 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: REFERRING MOTION #102 Cross MOTION to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC to Magistrate Judge Cabell(Vieira, Leonardo) Motion referred to Donald L. Cabell.
March 4, 2020 Filing 105 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #104 Motion to Seal (DLC, law2)
March 3, 2020 Filing 104 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 103 by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silberfarb, Michael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #90 MOTION for Protective Order and in Support re #102 CROSS MOTION filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Silberfarb, Michael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 102 Cross MOTION to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 30(d)(2) by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silberfarb, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Filing 101 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports that the parties have requested to Postpone Mediation Hearing. (York, Steve)
February 24, 2020 Filing 100 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Telephone Conference previously set for March 2, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. and the Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing previously set for March 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal is now Canceled. The parties should contact Magistrate Judge Boals deputy clerk, Steve York, to schedule a mediation if they believe it would be productive in the future. (York, Steve)
February 24, 2020 Filing 99 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #96 Consent Motion to Postpone Mediation. The parties should contact Magistrate Judge Boal's deputy clerk, Steve York, to schedule a mediation if they believe it would be productive in the future. (York, Steve)
February 21, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 21, 2020 Filing 97 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on February 10, 2020, before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. The Transcript may be purchased through Janice Russell at trussell31@tdsmail.com, reviewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Janice Russell Redaction Request due 3/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 20, 2020 Filing 96 Consent MOTION To Postpone Mediation by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Filing 95 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the forgoing reasons, the motion of plaintiff/counter-defendant Allscripts Healthcare, LLC to dismiss the claim of defendant/counter-claimant Decision Resources, LLC d/b/a Decision Resources Group ("DRG") for false and misleading statements in violation of Section 43(a)(1)(B) of the Lanham Act (Docket No. #34 ) is DENIED. Furthermore, the motion of DRG to enhance the Protective Order entered by this Court on September 11, 2019, (Docket No. #72 ) is DENIED. So Ordered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
February 20, 2020 Filing 94 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #92 Motion to Seal (Russo, Noreen)
February 20, 2020 Filing 93 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION #92 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 91 filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC, #90 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC to Magistrate Judge Cabell(Lima, Christine) Motions referred to Donald L. Cabell.
February 18, 2020 Filing 92 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 91 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
February 18, 2020 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Support re #90 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Nadel, Michael)
February 18, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for Protective Order by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 89 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2020 re #67 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC, #59 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. After argument, the court takes the motions under advisement. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Nadel, Knowley, Walters, Rhynhart Silberfarb Hannon) (Russo, Noreen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 88 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion(s): #59 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, #67 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 : Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to #67 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 (Leave to File Granted on 12/23/2019 by Dkt. No. 83) filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Silberfarb, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 86 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #67 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 (Leave To File Granted by Dkt. No. 85) filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Nadel, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 85 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (DLC, law2)
December 23, 2019 Filing 84 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #80 Motion to Seal (DLC, law2)
December 23, 2019 Filing 83 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #78 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (DLC, law2)
December 20, 2019 Filing 82 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to DRG's Rule 11 Motion (Dkt. No. 67) by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Surreply)(Nadel, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #72 MOTION for Protective Order to Enhance the Protective Order [Dkt. 57] filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Karen Erikson)(Nadel, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 80 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos. 78-2, 78-3, 78-4, 78-5, 78-6, 78-7, 78-8, and 78-9 by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silberfarb, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 79 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lauren H. Evans. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 16, 2019 Filing 78 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A Proposed Reply Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 1 to Reply, #4 Exhibit 2 to Reply, #5 Exhibit 3 to Reply, #6 Exhibit 4 to Reply, #7 Exhibit 5 to Reply, #8 Exhibit 6 to Reply, #9 Exhibit 7 to Reply)(Silberfarb, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 77 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lauren H. Evans Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8016415 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Walters, Sarah)
December 16, 2019 Filing 76 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #75 Motion to Seal. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 13, 2019 Filing 75 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos. 74, 74-1, 74-2, 74-3, 74-4, 74-5, 74-6, 74-7, 74-8, 74-9, 74-10, and 74-11 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 74 Opposition re #67 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Second Declaration of Patrick Baier)(Nadel, Michael) (Attachment 13 replaced on 12/11/2019) (Lima, Christine).
December 6, 2019 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support re #72 MOTION for Protective Order to Enhance the Protective Order [Dkt. 57] filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Silberfarb, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Protective Order to Enhance the Protective Order [Dkt. 57] by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silberfarb, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 71 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #64 Motion to Seal; granting #69 Motion to Seal (Russo, Noreen)
December 3, 2019 Filing 70 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION #69 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos. 65, 67, and 68 filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC, #67 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC to Magistrate Judge Cabell (Vieira, Leonardo) Motions referred to Donald L. Cabell.
December 2, 2019 Filing 69 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos. 65, 67, and 68 by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silberfarb, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Support re #67 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Silberfarb, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Silberfarb, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 66 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION #64 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos 59-1 and 60 filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC to Magistrate Judge Cabell(Lima, Christine) Motions referred to Donald L. Cabell.
November 25, 2019 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Silberfarb, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 64 Consent MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos 59-1 and 60 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 20, 2019 Filing 62 Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on August 2, 2019, before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Lajoie at lajoiedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 12/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2019 Filing 61 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell Referred for: Events Only (e). Motion referred: #59 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories. (Vieira, Leonardo) Motion referred to Donald L. Cabell.
November 10, 2019 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support re #59 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Nadel, Michael) (Main Document 60 replaced on 11/15/2019) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2019) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/15/2019) (Vieira, Leonardo). Modified on 11/15/2019 To flatten out files (Vieira, Leonardo). (Main Document 60 replaced on 11/22/2019) (Lima, Christine). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/22/2019) (Lima, Christine). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/22/2019) (Lima, Christine).
November 10, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/22/2019) (Lima, Christine).
September 16, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lucia A. Passanisi (Passanisi, Lucia)
September 11, 2019 Filing 57 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 56 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #55 Motion for Protective Order. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Walters, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 54 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jennifer B. Routh. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 53 EXHIBIT re #51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jennifer B. Routh Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7836381 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Walters, Sarah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 52 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #50 Joint Motion to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing to 03/05/2020. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing has been rescheduled for March 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. A Telephone Conference will be held on March 2, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Please review the earlier notice regarding rules and submissions prior to the mediation. (York, Steve)
August 16, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jennifer B. Routh Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7836381 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC.(Walters, Sarah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing to 03/05/2020 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC.(Walters, Sarah)
August 7, 2019 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for February 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for February 4, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve)
August 7, 2019 Filing 48 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jennifer C. Boal appointed.(Belpedio, Lisa)
August 5, 2019 Filing 47 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: February, 2020.(Lima, Christine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 46 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Scheduling Conference held on 8/2/2019: Automatic Discovery to be completed by 8/2/19; Amendments and/or Supplements to the Pleadings due by 10/31/2019; written discovery to be served by 11/30/19, answered by 12/31/19; fact Discovery to be completed by 1/31/2020; experts designated and Rule 26 Reports exchanged by 2/29/20, rebuttals by 3/15/20; expert depositions to be completed by 3/31/20; dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020, oppositions by 5/13/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Case to be referred to Mediation program: February, 2020. (Court Reporter: Debra Lajoie at lajoiedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Nadel, Walters, Rhynhart, Silverfarb, Hannon) (Lima, Christine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. NOTE- CHANGE IS AS TO TIME ONLY. (Lima, Christine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 44 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Nadel, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 42 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 27, 2019, before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Lajoie at lajoiedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 7/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 41 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the foregoing reasons, the cross motions for preliminary injunction (Docket Nos. 12 and 25) are DENIED. So ordered. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 3, 2019 Filing 40 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Nadel, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2019 re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC, #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. Court hears arguments from counsel and takes the matter under advisement. Court finds as moot #19 Motion to Expedite. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/19 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom No. 4. (Court Reporter: Debra Lajoie at lajoiedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Nadel, Spector, Hogarth, Knowles, Rhynhart, Silberfarb, Hannon) (Lima, Christine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 37 Opposition re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Counterclaim III filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Passanisi, Lucia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Walters on behalf of Allscripts Healthcare, LLC (Walters, Sarah)
May 31, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Counterclaim III filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Nadel, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Counterclaim III by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 33 Opposition re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Timothy Lyden, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hannon, Patrick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
May 29, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Nadel, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #28 Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 28 Opposition re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Hogue Declaration, #2 Reisinger Declaration, #3 Langan Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #5 Exhibit 2 - 2018 Certification, #6 Exhibit 3 - September 2014 Email, #7 Exhibit 4 - 2014 Certification, #8 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Breach, #9 Exhibit 6 - May 2 Email to DRG, #10 Exhibit 7 - 1st May 10 Letter to DRG, #11 Exhibit 8 - 2d May 10 Letter to DRG, #12 Exhibit 9 - 3d May 10 Letter to DRG)(Nadel, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #26 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
May 16, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Hogue Declaration, #2 Reisinger Declaration, #3 Langan Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #5 Exhibit 2 - 2018 Certification, #6 Exhibit 3 - September 2014 Email, #7 Exhibit 4 - 2014 Certification)(Nadel, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 24 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel E. Rhynhart. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 16, 2019 Filing 23 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael D. Silberfarb. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 15, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel E. Rhynhart Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7686921 by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Daniel E. Rhynhart)(Passanisi, Lucia)
May 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Silberfarb Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7686883 by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Michael D. Silberfarb)(Passanisi, Lucia)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit B, Proposed Deposition Notice)(Hannon, Patrick)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hannon, Patrick)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John P. Wixted. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John P. Wixted Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7684014 by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of John Wixted)(Passanisi, Lucia)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucia A. Passanisi on behalf of DR/Decision Resources, LLC (Passanisi, Lucia)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by DR/Decision Resources, LLC of Withdrawal of Defendant/Counterclaimant's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Hannon, Patrick)
May 12, 2019 Filing 14 Interim Opposition re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1st May 10 Letter to DRG, #2 Exhibit B - 2d May 10 Letter to DRG, #3 Exhibit C - 3d May 10 Letter to DRG, #4 Exhibit D - May 2 Email to DRG)(Knowles, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Sandler Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2, Master Data License Services Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3, September 2014 Certification, #4 Exhibit 4, October 2018 Certification, #5 Exhibit 5, November 2017 Certification, #6 Exhibit 6, February 15 2019 Allscripts Letter, #7 Exhibit 7, February 22 2019 E-mail, #8 Exhibit 8, February 28 2019 Allscripts Letter)(Hannon, Patrick)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for and Preliminary Injunction by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hannon, Patrick). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 5/23/2019 (Lima, Christine). Modified on 5/23/2019 (Lima, Christine).
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Allscripts Healthcare, LLC by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Master Data License Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2, September 2014 Certificate, #3 Exhibit 3, October 2018 Certification, #4 Exhibit 4, November 2017 Certification, #5 Exhibit February 15 2019 Allscripts Letter, #6 Exhibit 6, February 22 2019 Email, #7 Exhibit 7, February 28 2019 Allscripts Letter)(Hannon, Patrick)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DR/Decision Resources, LLC. (Hannon, Patrick)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah P. Hogarth. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael S. Nadel. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah P. Hogarth Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7669258 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Knowles, Matthew)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael S. Nadel Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7669224 by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Motion to Appear to Pro Hac Vice)(Knowles, Matthew)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Knowles, Matthew)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DR/Decision Resources, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DR/Decision Resources, LLC d/b/a Decision Resources Group Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7667243 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 JS45 Category Form)(Knowles, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC v. DR/Decision Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR/Decision Resources, LLC d/b/a Decision Resources Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR/Decision Resources, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Hannon
Represented By: Lucia A. Passanisi
Represented By: Michael D. Silberfarb
Represented By: Daniel E Rhynhart
Represented By: John P Wixted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Matthew L. Knowles
Represented By: Michael S Nadel
Represented By: Sarah E. Walters
Represented By: Sarah P Hogarth
Represented By: Robert J. Cordy
Represented By: Jennifer B Routh
Represented By: Lauren H Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?