Marchi v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda M. Marchi
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Fay Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11051
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. As a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal has been filed, the scheduling conference for 6/24 is cancelled. (Lyness, Paul)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Linda M. Marchi (Dion, Todd)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record (Halley, Taylor)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr. (Halley, Taylor) (Halley, Taylor).
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 6, 2019 to Respond to Complaint (Halley, Taylor)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 6, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Manganaro, Kevin)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Manganaro, Kevin)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fay Servicing, LLC. (Manganaro, Kevin)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trust, Not in Its Individual Capacity, But Solely as Trustee for BCAT 2015-14BTT (Bodurtha, Samuel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Manganaro on behalf of Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trust, Not in Its Individual Capacity, But Solely as Trustee for BCAT 2015-14BTT (Manganaro, Kevin)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fay Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trust, Not in Its Individual Capacity, But Solely as Trustee for BCAT 2015-14BTT ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7671465 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Manganaro, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marchi v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M. Marchi
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?