Pedreira v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Robert J. Pedreira, Sr.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv11061
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Filed by Robert J. Pedreira, Sr. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's REPLY to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Start Discovery. Filed by Robert J. Pedreira, Sr. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Summons. United States Attorney Served on May 28, 2019. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to the United States and mailed to Plaintiff on 5/8/2019 with Local Rule 4.1 and forms and instructions for service by the USMS. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Service by USMS and Local Rule 4.1)(PSSA, 3)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue a summons as to the United States. Plaintiff shall serve the summons, complaint, and this order upon Defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because Plaintiff is suing the United States, service must be made on the United States District Attorney for the District of Massachusetts and the United States Attorney General. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(1). Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of the issuance of the summons to complete service. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have the United States Marshals Service (USMS) complete service with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. [Mailed to plaintiff on 5/8/2019.] (PSSA, 3)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Appeal form) by Robert J. Pedreira, Sr.(Castilla, Francis)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert J. Pedreira, Sr.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedreira v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Pedreira, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?