Liberty Bay Credit Union v F/V Matter of Time, et al.
Plaintiff: Liberty Bay Credit Union
Defendant: F/V Matter of Time and Scott Akusis
Case Number: 1:2019cv11065
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Scott Akusis served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (McCann, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D. Pare, III on behalf of Liberty Bay Credit Union (Pare, Edward)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Bay Credit Union identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Bay Credit Union for Liberty Bay Credit Union.. (McCann, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Scott Akusis, F/V Matter of Time. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document #1, the corporate disclosure statement was filed as an attachment to the complaint, this should be a separate entry. Counsel should now refile the corporate disclosure statement. (Jones, Sherry)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Akusis, F/V Matter of Time Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7675809 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Liberty Bay Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCann, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Bay Credit Union v F/V Matter of Time, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Matter of Time
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Akusis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Bay Credit Union
Represented By: John H. McCann, III
Represented By: Edward D. Pare, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?