Neri v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: David Neri
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11080
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Scheduling Conference held on 6/19/2019, (All Discovery to be completed by 3/30/2020), (Further Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.). (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Dolan & Mountain) (Urso, Lisa)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Betke, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Dolan, Mark)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Dolan, Mark)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Mountain on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Mountain, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Betke, Christopher)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Betke on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Betke, Christopher)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 5/13/2018, answer due 6/3/2018. (Dolan, Mark)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed David Neri served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Dolan, Mark)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Costco Wholesale Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7678956 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by David Neri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Dolan, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neri v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Christopher G. Betke
Represented By: Thomas A. Mountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Neri
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?