Herring Creek Acquisition Company, LLC v. Herring Creek Farm Landowners Association, Inc.

Plaintiff: Herring Creek Acquisition Company, LLC
Defendant: Herring Creek Farm Landowners Association, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Farview MV Property, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11094
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Farview MV Property, LLC served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Chapman, Tyler)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Furman on behalf of Herring Creek Farm Landowners Association, Inc. (Furman, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Counter Defendant Farview MV Property, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Herring Creek Farm Landowners Association, Inc., having filed an Answer and counterclaim on June 28, 2019, (to which a response is due by July 19), the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 8/16/19; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties are due by 9/27/19. Without leave of court, the court permits 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the next 45 days, and expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. A party may not notice more than 5 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If all parties are interested in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 12/2/19 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 1/31/20. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/21/20, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 3/13/20; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 12/13/19, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule (Zierk, Marsha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Herring Creek Acquisition Company, LLC by Herring Creek Farm Landowners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Chapman, Tyler)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Herring Creek Farm Landowners Association, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7681404 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Herring Creek Acquisition Company, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Sheet)(Shea, Joseph) Modified on 5/13/2019 to correct docket entry. (Lara, Miguel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herring Creek Acquisition Company, LLC v. Herring Creek Farm Landowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herring Creek Farm Landowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler E. Chapman
Represented By: Matthew S. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herring Creek Acquisition Company, LLC
Represented By: Joseph F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Farview MV Property, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?