Tru Chocolate, Inc. v. Healthy Food Brands, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tru Chocolate, Inc.
Defendant: Healthy Food Brands, LLC and Simply Natural Foods, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11105
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Healthy Food Brands, LLC, Simply Natural Foods, LLC. (Siegal, Jack)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tru Chocolate, Inc.. (Deutsch, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Healthy Food Brands, LLC, Simply Natural Foods, LLC.(Siegal, Jack)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack I. Siegal on behalf of Healthy Food Brands, LLC, Simply Natural Foods, LLC (Siegal, Jack)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Tru Chocolate, Inc.. Healthy Food Brands, LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Tru Chocolate, Inc.. (Deutsch, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Tru Chocolate, Inc.. Simply Natural Foods, LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Tru Chocolate, Inc.. (Deutsch, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Brooks on behalf of Tru Chocolate, Inc. (Brooks, Steven)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7683293 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Tru Chocolate, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Cat Form 1)(Deutsch, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #2 Exhibit) (Coppola, Katelyn). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Coppola, Katelyn). Modified on 5/14/2019 to separate exhibits from complaint and add as an attachment (Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tru Chocolate, Inc. v. Healthy Food Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthy Food Brands, LLC
Represented By: Jack I. Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simply Natural Foods, LLC
Represented By: Jack I. Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tru Chocolate, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Brooks
Represented By: Daniel R. Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?