Wade v. Tritech Communications, Inc.

Plaintiff: Wade Kenneth and Kenneth Wade
Defendant: Tritech Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11120
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:case called; Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2019; counsel report case type and scope of discovery required; the court adopts the proposed schedule and sets next conference for 11/18/19 @ 10:00am. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Notis and Kessler) (Quinn, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/18/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Notis, Mitchell)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Notis, Mitchell)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Kenneth Wade.(Notis, Mitchell)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 DISREGARD -- ENTERED IN WRONG CASE. (Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER. Modified on 6/20/2019 (Dambrosio, Jolyne)).
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Kessler, Jamie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Kenneth Wade by Tritech Communications, Inc..(Kessler, Jamie)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Redocketed #8 using correct event code.) (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Tritech Communications, Inc. Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Kessler, Jamie)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Since this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, Defendant's counsel is reminded that a notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Tritech Communications, Inc. answer due 6/5/2019. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 5, 2019 to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Tritech Communications, Inc..(Kessler, Jamie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Freeman on behalf of Tritech Communications, Inc. (Freeman, Matthew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tritech Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7686236 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Kessler, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Tritech Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tritech Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie L. Kessler
Represented By: Matthew D. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Kenneth
Represented By: Mitchell J. Notis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wade
Represented By: Mitchell J. Notis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?