Breneman v. Champion Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emerson Breneman
Defendant: Marina V Plummer, Mark A. Turner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Marinosci Law Group P.C., Jay K Bray, Michael Cacciaguida, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Gary Marinosci, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Mr. Cooper, Champion Mortgage LLC, Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2018-3, Brendon Weiss, Chad A Marrone and Blaze Randazzo
Case Number: 1:2019cv11145
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merscorp Holdings, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc... (Gens, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Gens, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jay K Bray, Champion Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Mr. Cooper, Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2018-3, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Blaze Randazzo, Brendon Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Note, #2 Exhibit B -- Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C -- Assignment of Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D -- Nationstar Service Documentation, #5 Exhibit E -- MERS Service Documentation)(Gens, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jay K Bray, Champion Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Mr. Cooper, Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2018-3, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Blaze Randazzo, Brendon Weiss.(Gens, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Copy re 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, mailed to Emerson Breneman on 7/1/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Jay K Bray answer due 8/15/2019; Champion Mortgage LLC answer due 8/15/2019; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. answer due 8/15/2019; Mr. Cooper answer due 8/15/2019; Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2018-3 answer due 8/15/2019; Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 8/15/2019; Brendon Weiss answer due 8/15/2019; Blaze Randazzo answer due 8/15/2019. The court is not inclined to further extension. (mkz) Modified on 7/1/2019 to include Blaze Randazzo (Pacho, Arnold).
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 15, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint with Certificate of Service by Jay K Bray, Champion Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Mr. Cooper, Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2018-3, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Brendon Weiss.(Swisher, Meredith)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Gens on behalf of Jay K Bray, Champion Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Mr. Cooper, Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2018-3, Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Gens, Matthew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith A. Swisher on behalf of Jay K Bray, Champion Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Mr. Cooper, Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2018-3, Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Swisher, Meredith)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 1BST074551 for #1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emerson Breneman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet) (Vieira, Leonardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breneman v. Champion Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina V Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinosci Law Group P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay K Bray
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Matthew A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cacciaguida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Matthew A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Marinosci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Matthew A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Matthew A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Matthew A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar HECM Acquisition Trust 2018-3
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Matthew A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendon Weiss
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Matthew A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad A Marrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaze Randazzo
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Matthew A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Breneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?