Gamble v. PIM TRS Boston Back Bay, LLC
Plaintiff: George Gamble
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Hilton Boston Back Bay, Hilton Inc and PIM TRS Boston Back Bay, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11148
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to PIM TRS Boston Back Bay, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion to Amend (McKillop, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered D. #3 : Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED as moot in light of D. 16. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend #9 State Court Record Plaintiff's Complaint by George Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Nebenzahl on behalf of George Gamble (Nebenzahl, Andrew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 1:19-cv-00031.
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Stipulated #15 Motion to Dismiss ; granting Stipulated #15 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting Stipulated #15 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/20/19. (jmr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support , Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct and Memorandum in Support , Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff George Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Moton to Dismiss With Prejudice, Amend Complaitn and Change of Venue)(Bearnson, Bradley)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to file Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #3 . Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/2/19. (jlw) Modified on 5/2/2019 by adding link (jlw).
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff George Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bearnson, Bradley)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (jwt)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff George Gamble. (jwt)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #6 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 File Received from First District - Cache County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Notice of Removal) (las)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Hilton Boston Back Bay, Hilton Inc, Hilton Worldwide Holdings. (las)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/6/2019. (las)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff George Gamble, Defendants Hilton Boston Back Bay, Hilton Inc, Hilton Worldwide Holdings. Form due by 4/23/2019. (tlh)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff George Gamble and Defendants Hilton Boston Back Bay, Hilton Inc, Hilton Worldwide Holdings. (tlh)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: Case was initiated with the Plaintiff filing the Notice of Removal against the Defendant. Correction: The parties filing the Notice of Removal were corrected. re #1 Remark - New Case. (tlh)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Hilton Boston Back Bay, Hilton Inc, Hilton Worldwide Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of James Cowen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Frank Bruner)(Turner, Folasade)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Judicial District Court, Logan, case number 190100073, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3245092) filed by Hilton Inc, Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Hilton Boston Back Bay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Turner, Folasade)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendants Hilton Boston Back Bay, Hilton Inc and Hilton Worldwide Holdings are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) Modified on 4/5/2019 by correcting the parties responsible for filing the Notice of Removal(tlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. PIM TRS Boston Back Bay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gamble
Represented By: Aaron K. Bergman
Represented By: Bradley H. Bearnson
Represented By: Wayne K. Caldwell
Represented By: Andrew D. Nebenzahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings
Represented By: Folasade A. Turner
Represented By: Nicholas A. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Boston Back Bay
Represented By: Folasade A. Turner
Represented By: Nicholas A. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Inc
Represented By: Folasade A. Turner
Represented By: Nicholas A. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIM TRS Boston Back Bay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?