Pritemps v. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nikita Pritemps
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Edward F. Harrington
Case Number: 1:2019cv11150
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brian F. George (George, Brian)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 8/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. Counsel and principals are ORDERED to be present and to have full settlement authority. A brief mediation memorandum addressing both the merits of the case and the filing party's settlement position should be submitted to the court via email as an attachment to tracy_mclaughlin@mad.uscourts.gov by 7/31/2019 at 12:00P.M. The mediation memo should be marked "Confidential - Not for docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing parties. Counsel are asked to accommodate this date. In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time or the date poses a serious conflict, please contact Tracy McLaughlin at the email address above.(McLaughlin, Tracy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Edward F. Harrington appointed.(Belpedio, Lisa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Amal Bala re #11 Statement of counsel by Nikita Pritemps. (Bala, Amal)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Amal Bala by Nikita Pritemps. (Bala, Amal)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. re 9 Order,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bazarian, Stephen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. "It is black-letter law that a federal court has an obligation to inquire sua sponte into its own subject matter jurisdiction." McCulloch v. Velez, 364 F.3d 1, 5 (1st Cir. 2004). Whole Foods removed this case to federal court on the basis of diversity jurisdiction. On the Statement of Damages, however, the plaintiff only listed $32,569.40 in past and anticipated medical expenses. Dkt # 1-1 at 7. The court is not satisfied that on its face, the amount in controversy in this case meets the minimum $75,000 requirement. The parties will have until 6/12/2019 to submit a statement to convince the court otherwise, or this case will be remanded to Superior Court. SO ORDERED.(Tang, Danni)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc..(Bazarian, Stephen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amal Bala on behalf of Nikita Pritemps (Bala, Amal)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Whole Foods Market, Inc. for Whole Foods Market Group, Inc... (Bazarian, Stephen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Bazarian on behalf of Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. (Bazarian, Stephen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7695034 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bazarian, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritemps v. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen C. Bazarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikita Pritemps
Represented By: Brian F. George
Represented By: Amal Bala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Edward F. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?