McNeill v. Porter-Cable Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Scott McNeill
Defendant: Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. and Porter-Cable Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11156
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Halley, Taylor)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 9, 2019 to Make Service of Process (Halley, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 9, 2019 to Make Service of Process by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OF JEFF CHEN by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, Invoice, Packing Slip and PO [REDACTED PORTIONS])(Schuster, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Schuster, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd..(Schuster, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 STATE COURT Record. (Knowles, Andrea)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard A. Schuster. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard A. Schuster Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7716465 by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knowles, Andrea)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (DuFault, Douglas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Reset Deadlines: Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. Answer Due 6/21/2019. (Halley, Taylor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 21, 2019 to File Response to the Complaint (Halley, Taylor)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 21, 2019 to File Response to the Complaint by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd..(Knowles, Andrea)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Knowles, Andrea)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Studley Knowles on behalf of Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. (Knowles, Andrea)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7695738 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Knowles, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeill v. Porter-Cable Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott McNeill
Represented By: Douglas C. DuFault, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.
Represented By: Andrea Studley Knowles
Represented By: Richard A. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter-Cable Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?