Medacta International SA et al v. ConforMIS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Medacta International SA and Medacta USA, Inc.
Defendant: ConforMIS, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11160
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/22/2019 to File Answer by ConforMIS, Inc..(Abreu, Steven)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Medacta International SA, Medacta USA, Inc.. ConforMIS, Inc. waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Puzella, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ConforMIS, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura B. Najemy on behalf of Medacta International SA, Medacta USA, Inc. (Najemy, Laura)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medacta International SA, Medacta USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Medacta Holdings SA for Medacta International SA; Corporate Parent Medacta International SA for Medacta USA, Inc... (Puzella, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Puzella, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ConforMIS, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7698218 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Medacta International SA, Medacta USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Category Form)(Puzella, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medacta International SA et al v. ConforMIS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medacta International SA
Represented By: Laura B. Najemy
Represented By: Mark S. Puzella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medacta USA, Inc.
Represented By: Laura B. Najemy
Represented By: Mark S. Puzella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConforMIS, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?