Foley et al v. M&T Bank Corporation et al

Plaintiff: David Parenteau and Loraine Foley
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11162
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 30 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: SCHEDULING ORDER entered.(Simeone, Maria)
July 17, 2019 Filing 29 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Scheduling Conference held on 7/17/2019; Counsel state the status of the case. The court goes over the proposed schedule and adopts it as an order of the court setting the following deadlines. Initial disclosures by 8/12/19. Amendments by 10/14/19. Fact discovery by 1/31/2020. Plaintiffs experts designated by 2/29/20. Plaintiffs experts deposed by 4/30/20. Defendants trial experts designated by 3/29/20. Defendants trial experts deposed by 4/29/20. The court sets a status conference for 2/3/20 at 2:45pm. At that conference counsel shall be prepared to discuss, experts, mediation and dispositive motions. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2019. Discovery to be completed by 1/31/2020), ( Status Conference set for 2/3/2020 02:45 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.). (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 7/19/2019 (Simeone, Maria).
July 16, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE; Counsel wishing to appear by phone at the 7/17/19 scheduling conference may do so by calling into the court conference line at 888-675-2535 access code 9123576. re #17 Notice of Scheduling Conference, (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Simeone, Maria).
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 Notice Of Errata by Loraine Foley, David Parenteau to #26 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint as to Defendant M&T Bank . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Corrected Motion to Strike Defendant M&T Bank Corporation's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law)(Yousif, Nicola)
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint as to Defendant M&T Bank by Loraine Foley, David Parenteau.(Yousif, Nicola)
July 15, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Charpentier, Julianna)
July 11, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3). (LaPointe, Jenna)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by TransUnion, LLC re #14 Answer to Complaint Of Withdrawal Of Affirmative Defenses Nos. 5,6,7,10 And 14 And Amendment Of Affirmative Defense No. 13 (Jones, Erik)
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3). (Jones, Erik)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Loraine Foley, David Parenteau.(Yousif, Nicola)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Yousif, Nicola)
June 27, 2019 Filing 19 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Charpentier, Julianna)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by M&T Bank Corporation.(Adams, Jeffrey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 7/17/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order re summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (LaPointe, Jenna)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(LaPointe, Jenna)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC.(Jones, Erik)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Andrews Long on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Long, Danielle)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Charpentier, Julianna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Charpentier, Julianna)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Eric J. Jones, Esq.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Simeone, Maria) .
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed TransUnion, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Yousif, Nicola)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed M&T Bank Corporation served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Yousif, Nicola)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erik J. Jones Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7715980 by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Erik J. Jones)(Marashian, Mardic)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TransUnion, LLC. (Marashian, Mardic)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Yousif, Nicola)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Yousif, Nicola)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7698586 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Loraine Foley, David Parenteau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons - Equifax, #4 Summons - Experian, #5 Summons - M&T Bank, #6 Summons - Transunion)(Yousif, Nicola)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foley et al v. M&T Bank Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Parenteau
Represented By: Nicola S. Yousif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Foley
Represented By: Nicola S. Yousif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Andrews Long
Represented By: Julianna M. Charpentier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Mardic A. Marashian
Represented By: Erik J Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jenna L. LaPointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?