Mercado v. Berryhill et al
Plaintiff: Santiago Rosario Mercado
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew M. Saul
Not Yet Classified: U.S. Attorney Massachusetts and Attorney General USA
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv11172
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis J. George on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (George, Louis)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entries 9,10,11 Summons Returned Executed/Proof of Service Were Filed Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF by Counsel The Summons/Proof of Service Were Re-Docketed As Entries 12,13,14 Under the Correct Event in CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Attorney General of the United States by Santiago Rosario Mercado. (Paine, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Social Security Administration - Regional Office 1 by Santiago Rosario Mercado. (Paine, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney for the District of Massachusetts by Santiago Rosario Mercado. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Paine, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Santiago Rosario Mercado. US Attorney General served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Santiago Rosario Mercado. (Ferrari, Louis)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Santiago Rosario Mercado. US Attorney for the District of Massachusetts served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Santiago Rosario Mercado. (Ferrari, Louis)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Santiago Rosario Mercado. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Santiago Rosario Mercado. (Ferrari, Louis)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Local Rule 4.1 and instructions for service by the United States Marshals Service attached. USM 285 form may be found at www.usmarshals.gov/process/usm285.pdf and is also available from the Clerk upon request. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Service by USMS and Local Rule 4.1)(PSSA, 3)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons for service of the defendant. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshals Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, complaint and this order upon defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to complete service. (PSSA, 3)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Santiago Rosario Mercado.(Ferrari, Louis)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis David Ferrari on behalf of Santiago Rosario Mercado (Ferrari, Louis)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Santiago Rosario Mercado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local category form, #3 Addendum to the Complaint, #4 Exhibit A AC extension letter, #5 Exhibit B ALJ decision 8-1-17, #6 Exhibit C AC decision, #7 Exhibit D post hearing brief, #8 Exhibit E ALJ decision 7-7-16, #9 Exhibit F AC remand, #10 Exhibit G post hearing brief, #11 Exhibit H AC brief, #12 Exhibit I Chief Justice Bulletin, #13 Summons to U.S. Attorney District of Massachusetts)(Ferrari, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercado v. Berryhill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Christopher A. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Louis J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: U.S. Attorney Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Attorney General USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Rosario Mercado
Represented By: Louis David Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher A. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?