ViaTech Technologies, Inc. v. Adobe Inc.
Plaintiff: ViaTech Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Adobe Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11177
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Moffa on behalf of Adobe Inc. (Moffa, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Adobe Inc.. (Corbett, Gregory)
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Adobe Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corbett, Gregory)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Wing H. Liang. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher G. Hanewicz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Wing H. Liang Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7786095 by Adobe Inc..(Corbett, Gregory)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher G. Hanewicz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7786059 by Adobe Inc..(Corbett, Gregory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. DiMarco on behalf of Adobe Inc. (DiMarco, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F. Corbett on behalf of Adobe Inc. (Corbett, Gregory)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to July 18, 2019 to defendant answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's #1 complaint ViaTech Technologies, Inc. answer due 7/18/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to July 18, 2019 to defendant answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint by ViaTech Technologies, Inc..(Glovsky, Susan) Modified on 6/27/2019 (McDonagh, Christina).
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time (Folan, Karen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to July 2, 2019 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint by ViaTech Technologies, Inc..(Glovsky, Susan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. Adobe Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. Acknowledgement filed by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Glovsky, Susan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Adobe Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Aaron Hand. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Zachary. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Denise De Mory. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Glovsky, Susan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Aaron Hand Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7701424 by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Support of Motion)(Glovsky, Susan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Zachary Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7701401 by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Support of Motion)(Glovsky, Susan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Denise De Mory Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7701353 by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate In Support of Motion)(Glovsky, Susan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Glovsky, Susan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adobe Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7701282 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Glovsky, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ViaTech Technologies, Inc. v. Adobe Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ViaTech Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Zachary
Represented By: Susan G. L. Glovsky
Represented By: Aaron R. Hand
Represented By: Denise De Mory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Inc.
Represented By: Christopher G. Hanewicz
Represented By: Matthew J. Moffa
Represented By: Wing Liang
Represented By: Elizabeth A. DiMarco
Represented By: Gregory F. Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?