Pantano v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Cheryl Pantano
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11178
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2019 re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cheryl Pantano, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Arguments. Court takes under advisement #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; takes under advisement #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Joshua Markovits for the plaintiff. Amy Hackett and Joe Nguyen for the defendant.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Nguyen, Joe)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joshua Markovits. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joshua Markovits Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7782713 by Cheryl Pantano. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joshua Markovits)(Lemberg, Sergei)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Nguyen, Joe)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) : Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) filed by Cheryl Pantano. (Lemberg, Sergei)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Hackett, Amy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) Responses due by 6/28/2019 Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cheryl Pantano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lemberg, Sergei)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cheryl Pantano.(Lemberg, Sergei)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) by Cheryl Pantano.(Lemberg, Sergei)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joe N. Nguyen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joe N. Nguyen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7714240 by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Briansky, Richard)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hackett, Amy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (and Local Rule 7.1 Certification) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hackett, Amy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (Hackett, Amy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Briansky, Richard)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7701006 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Briansky, Richard) (State court record separated from Notice of Removal and filed as separate attachment on 5/24/2019: #3 Exhibit) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pantano v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Briansky
Represented By: Joe N. Nguyen
Represented By: Amy B. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Pantano
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Represented By: Joshua Markovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?