Andrews et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nuno Gomes, Titus Royal, Nicholas Young, Raymond Dunn, Dexter Andrews and Matthew Soler
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11182
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Dexter Andrews, Raymond Dunn, Nuno Gomes, Titus Royal, Matthew Soler, Nicholas Young. (Churchill, Stephen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Federal Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Comparison of Complaints)(Mee, Peter)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Amazon.com, Inc..(Mee, Peter)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Mee, Peter)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Amazon.com, Inc..(Mee, Peter)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Service of Process filed by Dexter Andrews, Raymond Dunn, Nuno Gomes, Titus Royal, Matthew Soler, Nicholas Young. Individual(s)/Entities served: Amazon.com, Inc.. (Churchill, Stephen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren M. Sellstrom on behalf of Dexter Andrews, Raymond Dunn, Nuno Gomes, Titus Royal, Matthew Soler, Nicholas Young (Sellstrom, Oren)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 8/22/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Amazon.com, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7702054 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Dexter Andrews, Raymond Dunn, Nuno Gomes, Titus Royal, Matthew Soler, Nicholas Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Churchill, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/24/2019 to correct PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuno Gomes
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titus Royal
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Young
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Dunn
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Andrews
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Soler
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J. Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?