Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc. v. Life Boost, Inc.
Plaintiff: Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Life Boost, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Marianne B. Bowler
Case Number: 1:2019cv11191
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 2/6/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. TRIAL counsel and ALL NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS are ORDERED to be present and to have full settlement authority UNLESS EXCUSED BY THE COURT. A brief mediation memorandum addressing both the merits of the case and the filing party's settlement position should be submitted to the court via facsimile to (617) 204-5833 or via email as an attachment to Christine_Patton@mad.uscourts.gov THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the hearing. The mediation memo should be marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing parties. Counsel are asked to accommodate this date. In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, contact the Courtroom Deputy. But, if the date poses a serious conflict, please do NOT contact the Courtroom Deputy directly regarding mediation scheduling. Counsel are to confer with opposing counsel and FILE AN ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO CONTINUE the mediation, including therein several proposed dates for which all counsel and principals are available.(Putnam, Harold)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Marianne B. Bowler appointed.(Belpedio, Lisa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: February, 2020.(Lima, Christine)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2019: Automatic Discovery to be completed by 7/26; Amendments and/or Supplements to the Pleadings due by 8/9/2019; written Discovery to be served by 11/30/19, answered by 12/31/2019; experts designated and Rule 26 Reports exchanged by 1/31/20; dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2020, oppositions by 4/30/20, replies (only with leave of Court) by 5/15/20 (to be 10 pages or less). Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Case to be referred to Mediation program: February, 2020. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Sergi, Donovan) (Lima, Christine) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Lima, Christine).
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Guy A. Sergi on behalf of Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc. (Sergi, Guy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Bagdady, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D) by Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc..(LeClair, L.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3). (LeClair, L.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc.. (LeClair, L.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of Life Boost, Inc. by Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc..(LeClair, L.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Boost, Inc.. (Donovan, Mark)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Justin P. Bagdady. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Justin P. Bagdady Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7717907 by Life Boost, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Justin P. Bagdady)(Donovan, Mark)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Donovan on behalf of Life Boost, Inc. (Donovan, Mark)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc. by Life Boost, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Work)(Furey, Alexander)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Furey on behalf of Life Boost, Inc. (Furey, Alexander)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT Record All Parties.. (Donovan, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Life Boost, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7704621 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donovan, Mark) Modified docket text on 5/28/2019 (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #3 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc. v. Life Boost, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Boost, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Donovan
Represented By: Justin P Bagdady
Represented By: Alexander Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venture Wireless Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: L. Richard LeClair, III
Represented By: Guy A. Sergi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Marianne B. Bowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?