Block Capital LLC v. King et al

Plaintiff: Block Capital LLC
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service, StonehamBank and Barbara King
Case Number: 1:2019cv11204
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT entered. (Urso, Lisa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered denying #13 Motion to Deposit Funds as moot in light of judgment entered this day; granting #17 Motion for Default Judgment; granting #19 Motion to Continue. 16.1 conference canceled. (Urso, Lisa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION to Continue scheduling conference to generally or cancel conference, or alternatively to convert it to a telephonic status conference by United States Internal Revenue Service.(Murphy, Edward)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #13 MOTION to Deposit Funds (Limited) filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Murphy, Edward)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment and Entry of Final Judgment as to StonehamBank, A Cooperative Bank by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of IRS Employee, #2 Proposed Final Judgment)(Murphy, Edward)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to StonehamBank (Urso, Lisa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Barbara King (Urso, Lisa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Entry of Default; granting #11 Motion for Entry of Default (Urso, Lisa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Block Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Service, #2 Affidavit Affidavit)(Manchini, Steven)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Murphy, Edward)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant StonehamBank by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward J. Murphy, #2 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default)(Murphy, Edward)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Barbara King by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward J. Murphy, #2 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default)(Murphy, Edward)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Internal Revenue Service.(Murphy, Edward)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Block Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Manchini, Steven)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 US Treasury Process Receipt and Return for summons, complaint, cover sheet, tracking order. Dept. of the Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service served Delivered on 04/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 certified mailing receipts, #2 certificate of service)(Manchini, Steven)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Barbara King served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Manchini, Steven)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed StonehamBank served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Manchini, Steven)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Complaint Filed in State Court)(Murphy, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Block Capital LLC v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Edward J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StonehamBank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Block Capital LLC
Represented By: Steven G. Manchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?