APL Microscopic, LLC v. Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Plaintiff: APL Microscopic, LLC
Defendant: Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11245
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #9 Joint Stipulation. Treated as a motion for extension of time and allowed. Defendant to file an answer to #1 Complaint by August 16, 2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M.C. Spieth on behalf of Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Spieth, Anita)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Joint) by Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Spieth, Anita)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Joel Benjamin Rothman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joel Benjamin Rothman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7742670 by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel Benjamin Rothman)(Moretto, Ana)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Moretto, Ana)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Moretto, Ana)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Moretto, Ana)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7716190 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Moretto, Ana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APL Microscopic, LLC v. Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APL Microscopic, LLC
Represented By: Ana Paula Moretto
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Anita M.C. Spieth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?