Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Paychex, Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Paychex, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11272
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paychex, Inc.. (Martin, Andrea)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Paychex, Inc..(Martin, Andrea)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Peter J. Chassman and Michael J. Forbes. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter J. Chassman and Michael J. Forbes Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7781045 by Paychex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Peter J. Chassman, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Michael J. Forbes)(Martin, Andrea)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L. Martin on behalf of Paychex, Inc. (Martin, Andrea)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Paychex, Inc. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Hayes, Paul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Foster, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Hayes, Paul)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Hayes, Paul)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paychex, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7721792 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form, #5 Summons)(Hayes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Paychex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paychex, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Forbes
Represented By: Andrea L. Martin
Represented By: Peter J. Chassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?