Brown v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Pama L Brown
Defendant: Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Julian D. Wright
3Rd Party Defendant: Daniel A. Brown
Case Number: 1:2019cv11273
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Daniel A. Brown, filed by Julian D. Wright.(Haverty, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Julian D. Wright.(Haverty, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Julian D. Wright served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Sousa, Theresa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Sousa, Theresa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference REset for 8/15/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Williams, Marykate)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Haverty on behalf of Julian D. Wright (Haverty, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marykate E. Williams on behalf of Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Williams, Marykate)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph C. Sullivan on behalf of Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Sullivan, Ralph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Tapalian on behalf of Pama L Brown (Tapalian, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Pama L Brown. (Sousa, Theresa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7721967 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Pama Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sousa, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk & Dedham Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Marykate E. Williams
Represented By: Ralph C. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pama L Brown
Represented By: Theresa L. Sousa
Represented By: David C. Tapalian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Julian D. Wright
Represented By: John W. Haverty
Represented By: Robert F. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Daniel A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?