Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Athenahealth, Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Athenahealth, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11278
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Athenahealth, Inc. answer due 8/28/2019. (Tang, Danni)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Athenahealth, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent athenahealth Holding Corp. for Athenahealth, Inc... (Sebel, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 28, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Athenahealth, Inc..(Sebel, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James N. Sebel on behalf of Athenahealth, Inc. (Sebel, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Pearson on behalf of Athenahealth, Inc. (Pearson, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Berntsen on behalf of Athenahealth, Inc. (Berntsen, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Dillon on behalf of Athenahealth, Inc. (Dillon, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven R. Katz on behalf of Athenahealth, Inc. (Katz, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Athenahealth, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Hayes, Paul)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Foster, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Hayes, Paul)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Hayes, Paul)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Athenahealth, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7722247 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Hayes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Athenahealth, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athenahealth, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Katz
Represented By: Matthew C. Berntsen
Represented By: James N. Sebel
Represented By: Christopher R. Dillon
Represented By: Andrew G. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?