Lee v. Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara F Lee
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc., HBW Industries, Inc. f/k/a The Hodge Boiler Works, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc. f/k/a Erie City Ironworks, BW/IP International, Inc., as Successor to Byron Jackson Pumps, Uniroyal, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Orr & Sembower Incorporated, Crosby Valve, Inc., Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, Alfa Laval, Inc. Individually and as Successor to The De Laval Separator Co. and Sharples Co., Trane U.S. Inc. f/k/a American Standard, Inc., ABB Air Preheater, Inc. f/k/a The Air Preheater Company, Inc., P.S. Thorsen Co. of Mass., New England Insulation Company, Goulds Pump Incorporated, ILG Industries, Inc. f/k/a ILG Ventilation Co., O'Connor Constructors, Inc. f/k/a Thomas O'Connor Company, Inc., Taco, Inc., Marotta Controls, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, The William Powell Company, York International Corporation, Power Piping Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Ross Heat Exchanger Division of American Standard, Inc., General Insulation Company, Flowserve US, Inc. as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co., Edward Valves, Inc. and Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Co., Inc., Durco International, Inc. and Byron Jackson Company, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation, Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company, Crane Co., as successor to Cochrane Corp., Aurora Pump Co., Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., The Nash Engineering Company, Viad Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell, FMC f/k/a Northern Pump and Peerless Pump Co., General Electric Company, Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. n/k/a Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Zurn Industries, Inc., Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., BW/IP International, Inc., HBW Industries, Inc., ABB Air Preheater, Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Trane U.S. Inc., CBS Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., FMC, O'Connor Constructors, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Flowserve Corporation, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc., Viad Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., ILG Industries, Inc., Ross Heat Exchanger and IMO Industries
Case Number: 1:2019cv11284
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Marotta Controls, Inc. (Rooney, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Crosby Valve, Inc. (Rooney, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Rooney, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodorus D.J. Urbanski on behalf of Marotta Controls, Inc. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
August 6, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodorus D.J. Urbanski on behalf of Crosby Valve, Inc. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
August 6, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodorus D.J. Urbanski on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
August 6, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Chase A. Marshall on behalf of Marotta Controls, Inc. (Marshall, Chase)
August 6, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Chase A. Marshall on behalf of Crosby Valve, Inc. (Marshall, Chase)
August 6, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Chase A. Marshall on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Marshall, Chase)
August 6, 2019 Filing 111 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 8/6/2019. Court reviews 899 Agenda with counsel. Further date set. (Status Conference set for 10/7/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.). (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Wainwright, Shepard, Conserve, Armato, Chambers, Vinson, et al) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Putnam, Harold)
August 5, 2019 Filing 110 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Marotta Controls, Inc..(Ludlum, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Ludlum on behalf of Marotta Controls, Inc. (Ludlum, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 108 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crosby Valve, Inc..(Ludlum, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Ludlum on behalf of Crosby Valve, Inc. (Ludlum, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc..(Ludlum, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Ludlum on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Ludlum, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 104 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 8/5/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
August 1, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE: this case is now associated with the other Massachusetts Asbestos Litigation cases. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-11284-ADB et al.(Putnam, Harold)
August 1, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Amy LaBrecque on behalf of Ross Heat Exchanger (LaBrecque, E.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Amy LaBrecque on behalf of Trane U.S. Inc. (LaBrecque, E.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Thaddeus M. Lenkiewicz on behalf of BW/IP International, Inc. (Lenkiewicz, Thaddeus)
July 23, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of BW/IP International, Inc. (McCarthy, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 98 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
July 22, 2019 Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurn Industries, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
July 18, 2019 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taco, Inc.. (Young, Kevin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Young on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Young, Kevin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HBW Industries, Inc.. (Lavoie, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B. Lavoie on behalf of HBW Industries, Inc. (Lavoie, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander E. Terry on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Terry, Alexander)
July 10, 2019 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uniroyal, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Brenner on behalf of Uniroyal, Inc. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve Corporation. (Lenkiewicz, Thaddeus)
July 9, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Thaddeus M. Lenkiewicz on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Lenkiewicz, Thaddeus)
July 9, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (McCarthy, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Lee on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company (Lee, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company (Mackler, Joni)
July 9, 2019 Filing 84 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company. (Claflin, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company (Claflin, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE: should counsel desire this case to be associated with the other Massachusetts Asbestos Litigation cases, they may contact the clerk at hal_putnam@mad.uscourts.gov. (Putnam, Harold)
July 2, 2019 Filing 81 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Dwyer, Paul)
July 2, 2019 Filing 80 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMC. (Dwyer, Paul)
June 25, 2019 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Lenkiewicz, Thaddeus)
June 25, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Thaddeus M. Lenkiewicz on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Lenkiewicz, Thaddeus)
June 25, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (McCarthy, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 76 STATE COURT Record. (Mohan, Catherine)
June 20, 2019 Filing 75 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Laval, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval, Inc... (Lenkiewicz, Thaddeus)
June 20, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Thaddeus M. Lenkiewicz on behalf of Alfa Laval, Inc. (Lenkiewicz, Thaddeus)
June 20, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of Alfa Laval, Inc. (McCarthy, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 20, 2019 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 20, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 20, 2019 Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 20, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 20, 2019 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 20, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of York International Corporation (Tayyab, J.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Co.. (Rasmussen, Shaina)
June 20, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaina A. Rasmussen on behalf of Aurora Pump Co. (Rasmussen, Shaina)
June 20, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Waksler on behalf of Aurora Pump Co. (Waksler, Craig)
June 20, 2019 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation.. (George, Wayne)
June 20, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of York International Corporation (George, Wayne)
June 19, 2019 Filing 60 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 19, 2019 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO Industries. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 18, 2019 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Metso USA for Neles-Jamesbury, Inc... (Jackson, Susan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Insulation Company. (Jackson, Susan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. (Jackson, Susan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of General Insulation Company (Jackson, Susan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Jackson, Susan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 53 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 18, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Viad Corp.(as Successor to Griscom Russell).(Netburn, Peter)
June 18, 2019 Filing 51 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Viad Corp.(as Successor to Griscom Russell).(Netburn, Peter)
June 18, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Viking Pump, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 18, 2019 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Viad Corp.(as Successor to Griscom Russell). (Netburn, Peter)
June 18, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Netburn on behalf of Viad Corp.(as Successor to Griscom Russell) (Netburn, Peter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 47 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC.(Dwyer, Paul)
June 17, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Felice, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Felice, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Felice, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Shannon, Anne)
June 17, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of General Electric Company (Shannon, Anne)
June 17, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Emmanuel, Stesha)
June 17, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of General Electric Company (Emmanuel, Stesha)
June 17, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Velan Valve Corp.. (Mohan, Catherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Velan Valve Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation.. (Mohan, Catherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 37 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Mohan, Catherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Mohan, Catherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 33 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. (York, Steve)
June 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
June 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of FMC f/k/a Northern Pump and Peerless Pump Co. (Watts, Clint)
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of FMC f/k/a Northern Pump and Peerless Pump Co. (Dwyer, Paul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Zurn Industries, Inc. f/k/a Erie City Ironworks (Riordan, Meghan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of New England Insulation Company (Riordan, Meghan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (Riordan, Meghan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company (Riordan, Meghan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Zurn Industries, Inc. f/k/a Erie City Ironworks (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of New England Insulation Company (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Zurn Industries, Inc. f/k/a Erie City Ironworks (Perritano, Judith)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Perritano, Judith)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of New England Insulation Company (Perritano, Judith)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (Perritano, Judith)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company (Perritano, Judith)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7724661 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Complaint), #4 Exhibit B (Summons and Proof of Service), #5 Exhibit C (Plaintiff's Disclosure Form))(Mohan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBW Industries, Inc. f/k/a The Hodge Boiler Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc. f/k/a Erie City Ironworks
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International, Inc., as Successor to Byron Jackson Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Alexander E. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orr & Sembower Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, Inc.
Represented By: Chase A. Marshall
Represented By: Theodorus D.J. Urbanski
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Robert S. Ludlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc. Individually and as Successor to The De Laval Separator Co. and Sharples Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S. Inc. f/k/a American Standard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Air Preheater, Inc. f/k/a The Air Preheater Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.S. Thorsen Co. of Mass.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Insulation Company
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pump Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILG Industries, Inc. f/k/a ILG Ventilation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Connor Constructors, Inc. f/k/a Thomas O'Connor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marotta Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Chase A. Marshall
Represented By: Theodorus D.J. Urbanski
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Robert S. Ludlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Thaddeus M. Lenkiewicz
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Piping Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Adam C. Martin
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Heat Exchanger Division of American Standard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Insulation Company
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc. as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co., Edward Valves, Inc. and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Co., Inc., Durco International, Inc. and Byron Jackson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co., as successor to Cochrane Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Co.
Represented By: Shaina A. Rosenbleet
Represented By: Craig R. Waksler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC f/k/a Northern Pump and Peerless Pump Co.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. n/k/a Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Chase A. Marshall
Represented By: Theodorus D.J. Urbanski
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Robert S. Ludlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International, Inc.
Represented By: Thaddeus M. Lenkiewicz
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBW Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Mark B. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Air Preheater, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S. Inc.
Represented By: E. Amy LaBrecque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Thaddeus M. Lenkiewicz
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Connor Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Represented By: Michael T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Thaddeus M. Lenkiewicz
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Peter C. Netburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILG Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Heat Exchanger
Represented By: E. Amy LaBrecque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara F Lee
Represented By: Andrew S. Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?