Vegnani v. Medlogix, LLC
Plaintiff: Anthony Vegnani
Defendant: Medlogix, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11291
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Medlogix, LLC.(Calandrelli, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION to Dismiss by Medlogix, LLC.(Calandrelli, Joseph) Modified on 8/2/2019 to correct description of pleading. Counsel was requested to file the motion to dismiss (Montes, Mariliz).
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time is ALLOWED. Defendant's Answer to Complaint due by 8/2/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Medlogix, LLC. (Calandrelli, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Anthony Vegnani. Medlogix, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Anthony Vegnani. (Callanan, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Medlogix, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Anthony Vegnani. (Callanan, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Anthony Vegnani. (Callanan, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medlogix, LLC formerly known as Consolidated Services Group, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7725986 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Anthony Vegnani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Callanan, Christopher) Modified docket text on 6/11/2019 (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vegnani v. Medlogix, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medlogix, LLC
Represented By: Joseph P. Calandrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Vegnani
Represented By: Christopher A Callanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?