Viana et al v. Cronen et al
Petitioner: munique viana santos and Francis Viana
Respondent: Christopher Cronen, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr. and Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2019cv11296
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Paine, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher Cronen, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Antone Moniz. (Sady, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Christopher Cronen, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Antone Moniz of Intent to File Reply to Petitioner's Opposiiton to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (Sady, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's June 12, 2019 Order filed by Francis Viana, munique viana santos. (Sullivan, Gregory)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioners' Petition for Writ of Habeus Corpus filed by Francis Viana, munique viana santos. (Sullivan, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , #14 MOTION for Reconsideration . Responses due on or by 7/17/2019. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 13, 2019 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 17, 2019 to File Petitioners Memorandums in Opposition to the Respondents pending Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Dismiss by Francis Viana, munique viana santos.(Sullivan, Gregory) (Modified on 7/15/2019 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Judge Mark L. Wolf no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 After consultation with Judge Young, this case should be re-assigned pursuant to Local Rule 40.1. (Loret, Magdalena)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to July 15, 2019 to File Petitioners Memorandums in Opposition to the Respondents pending Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Dismiss Filed by Francis Viana, munique viana santos.(Sullivan, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration by Christopher Cronen, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sady, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher Cronen, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sady, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Cronen, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Antone Moniz.(Sady, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint by Christopher Cronen, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Antone Moniz. (Sady, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10225-MLW, 1:18-cv-11596-MLW, 1:19-cv-10258-MLW, 1:19-cv-10400-MLW, 1:19-cv-11296-MLW(Loret, Magdalena)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (267) Motion to Seal in case 1:18-cv-10225-MLW Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10225-MLW, 1:18-cv-11596-MLW, 1:19-cv-10258-MLW, 1:19-cv-10400-MLW, 1:19-cv-11296-MLW(Loret, Magdalena)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re #5 Letter/request (non-motion) (Loret, Magdalena)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Christopher Cronen, Kevin McAleenan, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Antone Moniz (Sady, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter/request (non-motion) from Petitioners to Respondents Requesting Release from ICE Custody By Father's Day. (Sullivan, Gregory)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The case was forwarded to the undersigned for preliminary review as emergency judge. 1.The Clerk of this Court shall serve forthwith a copy of the petition (Docket No. 1) upon respondents and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 2.The parties, including the United States, shall confer and, by June 21, 2019, shall report, jointly if possible, but separately if necessary: (a) whether they have reached an agreement to resolve this case; and, if not, (b) whether they request more time to continue their discussions and/or for the briefing required in paragraph 3 of this Order. 3.If the parties have not reached an agreement to resolvethe case, respondents shall, by June 28, 2019, respond to the petition. See 28 U.S.C. 2243. Petitioners shall file any reply by July 8, 2019. 4.In order to preserve the court's jurisdiction, to provide the parties an opportunity to attempt to resolve this caseand, if necessary, to brief the issues properly, petitioner shallnot be moved outside the District of Massachusetts, temporarily orpermanently, during the pendency of this case. See 28 U.S.C.1651(a) ("[A]ll courts established by Act of Congress may issueall writs necessary or appropriate in aid of their respectivejurisdictions and agreeable to the usages and principles of law.").This requirement may be reconsidered by the court sua sponte or upon motion by either party. (PSSA, 4)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Second PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7726498 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Francis Viana, munique viana santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-130 Petitition Approval, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #3 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viana et al v. Cronen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: munique viana santos
Represented By: Gregory M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francis Viana
Represented By: Gregory M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Cronen
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?