McDermet v. DIRECTV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party William McDermet
Defendant: Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc., David Christopher and DIRECTV, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11322
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 03:10 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order Template)(Bono, Christine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DIRECTV, LLC, The DIRECTV Group, Inc.. (Steinmetz, Kyle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint And Jury Demand by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc..(Steinmetz, Kyle)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion to Amend (Bono, Christine)
July 14, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Amend #12 Amended Complaint, #9 State Court Record Complaint by William McDermet.(McDermet, William)
July 14, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William McDermet.(McDermet, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants - Response to Complaint due by 7/23/2019. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Treating the #8 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint as a motion, the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by July 23, 2019. Court will reset the deadline. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Halley, Taylor)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc.. (Cowley, Steven)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kyle J. Steinmetz, Esq.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kyle J. Steinmetz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7738337 by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc..(Cowley, Steven)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Warnock, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (adminn, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DIRECTV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The DIRECTV Group Inc., Corporate Parent DIRECTV Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for DIRECTV, LLC.. (Cowley, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The DIRECTV Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for The DIRECTV Group, Inc... (Cowley, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Christopher, DIRECTV, LLC, Nick Jones, The DIRECTV Group, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7731340 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form)(Cowley, Steven) (Attachment 6 replaced on 6/14/2019 due to missing counsel signature (Warnock, Douglas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermet v. DIRECTV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Jones
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Represented By: Kyle J. Steinmetz
Represented By: Gina M. Puls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The DIRECTV Group, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Represented By: Kyle J. Steinmetz
Represented By: Gina M. Puls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Christopher
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Represented By: Kyle J. Steinmetz
Represented By: Gina M. Puls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Represented By: Kyle J. Steinmetz
Represented By: Gina M. Puls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party William McDermet
Represented By: William W. McDermet, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?