Drew Company, Inc. v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Drew Company, Inc.
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv11338
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (McKillop, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Poswistilo on behalf of Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski (Poswistilo, Susan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew Company, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew Company, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew Company, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Drew Company, Inc.. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Drago, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Press on behalf of Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski (Press, Joshua)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7734740 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Drew Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Category Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drago, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drew Company, Inc. v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Company, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Drago, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?