Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC v. Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC
Defendant: Kristopher M. Coleman and Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11348
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief , for a Pre-Trial Replevin Order, and for a Real Estate Attachment. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton.
August 8, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #19 Motion for Extension of Time (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, and reschedule August 12, 2019 injunctive relief motion hearing date to after responsive pleading deadline by Kristopher M. Coleman, Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC.(Alley, Kimberly)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief , for a Pre-Trial Replevin Order, and for a Real Estate Attachment : Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Kristopher M. Coleman answer due 7/29/2019; Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC answer due 7/29/2019. (Lima, Christine)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 29, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Kristopher M. Coleman, Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC.(Alley, Kimberly)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC. (Alley, Kimberly)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Alley on behalf of Kristopher M. Coleman, Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC (Alley, Kimberly)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief , for a Pre-Trial Replevin Order, and for a Real Estate Attachment. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Lima, Christine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief , for a Pre-Trial Replevin Order, and for a Real Estate Attachment : Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Himelfarb, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Himelfarb, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Letter/request (non-motion) from Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion for a Pre-Trial Replevin Order, a TRO, and a Real Estate Attachment. (Himelfarb, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kristopher M. Coleman served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Himelfarb, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief , for a Pre-Trial Replevin Order, and for a Real Estate Attachment filed by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC. (Himelfarb, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief , for a Pre-Trial Replevin Order, and for a Real Estate Attachment by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC.(Himelfarb, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Currie, Haley)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC. (Himelfarb, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against Kristopher M. Coleman, Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7737070 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Inventory Financing Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - UCC Financing Statements, #3 Exhibit C - Guaranty, #4 Exhibit D - Transaction Statements, #5 Exhibit E - Inventory Check Report, #6 Exhibit F - 2-25-19 Letter, #7 Exhibit G - 3-15-19 Letter, #8 Exhibit H - 5-19-19 Letter, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Category Form)(Himelfarb, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC v. Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC
Represented By: David Himelfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher M. Coleman
Represented By: Kimberly A. Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Power Generators of New England, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly A. Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?