Hickey v. Thompkins et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Hickey
Defendant: Jane Doe, Naphcare Medical Department, Jane Doe # 7, John Doe # 2, Jane Doe # 6, Jane Doe # 3, Jane Doe # 2, Jane Doe # 10, Jane Doe # 9, Jane Doe # 8, Jane Doe # 5, John Doe # 1, Steven Thompkins, Jane Doe # 4, Jane Doe # 1, Yolanda Smith, Superintendent Michael Colwell and Sheriff Steven Tompkins
Case Number: 1:2019cv11349
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed Naphcare Medical Department served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Defendants' Motion to Waive Local Rule 7.1 (a)(2). ( A copy of this Order has been mailed to the Plaintiff) (Montes, Mariliz)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 DOCKET SHEET sent to Plaintiff (Montes, Mariliz)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 8/28/2019 (Montes, Mariliz)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Thomas Hickey. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Waiver of Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) by Michael Colwell, Yolanda Smith, Steven Tompkins.(Garand, Melissa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 28, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Colwell, Yolanda Smith, Steven Tompkins.(Garand, Melissa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa J. Garand on behalf of Michael Colwell, Yolanda Smith, Steven Tompkins (Garand, Melissa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendants Colwell, Tompkins and Smith shall file a response to the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by August 21, 2019. The Clerk's Office shall by mail a copy of this Order directed to the General Counsel's Office, Suffolk County Sheriff, c/o Nashua Street Jail, 200 Nashua Street, Boston MA 02114 as well as a courtesy phone notice to that office. re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Hickey, #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomas Hickey, Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion.( Responses due by 8/21/2019)(Simeone, Maria) Modified on 8/8/2019 (Simeone, Maria).
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Hickey. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Thomas Hickey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas Hickey in Support of Motion)(Montes, Mariliz)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Yolanda Smith served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Steven Tompkins served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Colwell served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at South Bay House of Correction. Copies mailed to Treasurer and to the plaintiff. (PSSA, 4) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/11/2019) (PSSA, 4).
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Colwell, Naphcare Medical Department, Yolanda Smith, Steven Tompkins. Summons mailed to plantiff with notice for service by USMS, USM-285 forms, L.R. 4.1 and courtesy copy of the complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Attachments: #1 notice to plaintiff and LR 4.1)(PSSA, 4)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered 1. The Application #2 to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit (ECF No. 1) is ALLOWED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $5.40. The remainder of the fee, $344.60, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). 2. The Clerk shall issue summonses as to the identified defendants only as follows: (1) Steven Tompkins, Suffolk County Sheriff; (2) Michael Colwell, Superintendent Nashua Street Jail; (3) Yolanda Smith, Superintendent South Bay House of Correction; and (4) Naphcare. The Clerk shall send the summonses, a copy of the complaint, and this Order to the plaintiff, who must serve the identified defendants with these documents in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshals Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshals Service shall serve the above-referenced documents and this Order upon the identified defendants, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding this Order to the United States Marshal Service, it remains plaintiffs responsibility to provide the United States Marshal Service with all necessary paperwork and service information. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to complete service.3.No summonses shall issue with respect to any John or Jane Doe defendants. Although the use of fictitious names to identify defendants is not favored, situations may arise where the identity of an alleged defendant cannot be known prior to the filing of a complaint. See Martnez-Rivera v. Ramos, 498 F.3d 3, 8 (1st Cir. 2007). If, through discovery, the plaintiff discovers the true name of any or all of the Doe defendants, he should act promptly to amend the complaint to substitute the correct parties and to dismiss any baseless claims. Id. at 8 n.5.(PSSA, 4)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Hickey. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Inmate Statement)(Castilla, Francis)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Hickey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickey v. Thompkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Thompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe # 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Smith
Represented By: Melissa J. Garand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Michael Colwell
Represented By: Melissa J. Garand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Steven Tompkins
Represented By: Melissa J. Garand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?