Klein v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Steve Klein
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan and Michael F. Mahoney
Petitioner: John Curry
Case Number: 1:2019cv11356
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 34 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Joint Motion and Order Setting Time to Respond to Complaint and Briefing Schedule: Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve an Amended Complaint or shall designate the existing Complaint as the operative complaint on or before September 20, 2019.;Defendants shall move, answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before October 25, 2019; If Defendants file a motion directed at the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve any opposition on or before November 27, 2019; Defendants shall file and serve any reply on or before December 20, 2019. (Bono, Christine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 33 Joint MOTION And [Proposed] Order Setting Time To Respond To Complaint And Briefing Schedule by Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney.(Nanda, Alisha)
July 17, 2019 Filing 32 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVING LEAD COUNSEL(Halley, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeremy A. Lieberman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 30 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added J. Alexander Hood II. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeremy A. Lieberman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7777794 by Steve Klein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Andrews, Daryl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of J. Alexander Hood II Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7777769 by Steve Klein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Andrews, Daryl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff under the PSLRA and Proposed Order Appointing Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Approving Co-Lead Counsel by John Curry, Steve Klein. (Andrews, Daryl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION And Stipulation For Order Regarding Response To Complaint And For Submitting Proposed Schedule by Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney.(Carroll, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff under the PSLRA filed by Steve Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Andrews, Daryl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff under the PSLRA filed by Steve Klein. (Andrews, Daryl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff under the PSLRA by Steve Klein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, Daryl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by John Curry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PSLRA Certification, #2 Exhibit Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit LK Resume)(Hopkins, Shannon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by John Curry. (Hopkins, Shannon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by John Curry. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Shannon)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03642.
June 18, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Massachusetts (mro)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, and respectfully requested, by and among the undersigned counsel for the respective Parties, subject to approval of the Court, that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, the above-captioned matter be transferred to the District of Massachusetts. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/18/2019) (mro)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney. (Nanda, Alisha)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #12 Motion for James R. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED, this 12th day of June 2019, that such motion is GRANTED.(Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/12/2019) (ama)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pursuant to Rule 2.B of Your Honor's Individual Practices addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Alisha Q. Nanda dated June 11, 2019. Document filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney.(Nanda, Alisha)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yaw Asare Anim on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney. (Anim, Yaw)
June 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for James R. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17052456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for James R. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17052456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James R. Carroll, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alisha Quintana Nanda on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney. (Nanda, Alisha)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Drylewski, Alexander)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander C Drylewski on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney. (Drylewski, Alexander)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Daniel J. Brennan waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Document filed by Steve Klein. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael F. Mahoney waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Document filed by Steve Klein. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Document filed by Steve Klein. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Steve Klein. (Hood, Joseph)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney. (jgo)
April 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
April 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
April 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Steve Klein. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boston Scientific Corporation, Michael F. Mahoney, and Daniel J. Brennan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steve Klein. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation, Daniel J. Brennan, Michael F. Mahoney. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16754321)Document filed by Steve Klein.(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Alisha Quintana Nanda
Represented By: Alexander C Drylewski
Represented By: Yaw Asare Anim
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Brennan
Represented By: Alisha Quintana Nanda
Represented By: Alexander C Drylewski
Represented By: Yaw Asare Anim
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Mahoney
Represented By: Alisha Quintana Nanda
Represented By: Alexander C Drylewski
Represented By: Yaw Asare Anim
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Klein
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Curry
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?