Zarba et al v. The Town of Oak Bluffs et al
Plaintiff: Susan Lemoie Zarba and John Zarba
Defendant: George Warren, Ronald Rappaport, Kris Chvatal, Llewellyn Rogers, The Law Firm of Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney, Robert Whritenour, Michael Perry, David Bailey, Peter Yoars, Mark Barbadoro, Thomas Perry, Michael Goldsmith, The Town of Oak Bluffs, Joe Re and Andrea Rogers
Case Number: 1:2019cv11368
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 47 DOCKET SHEET sent to Plaintiffs (Montes, Mariliz)
August 13, 2019 Filing 46 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Simeone, Maria)
August 13, 2019 Filing 45 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that the plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html (Montes, Mariliz)Copy mailed to plaintiffs(Montes, Mariliz).
August 12, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal OF DEFENDANT GEORGE WARREN by David Bailey, Mark Barbadoro, Kris Chvatal, Michael Goldsmith, Michael Perry, Thomas Perry, Ronald Rappaport, Joe Re, Andrea Rogers, Llewellyn Rogers, The Law Firm of Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney, The Town of Oak Bluffs, George Warren, Robert Whritenour, Peter Yoars. (Cloherty, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 43 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel CONCERNING DEFENDANT GEORGE WARREN. (Cloherty, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave (unopposed) to file electronically Pro Se by John Zarba, Susan Lemoie Zarba.(Montes, Mariliz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Exhibit A) (Montes, Mariliz).
August 9, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by John Zarba, Susan Lemoie Zarba.(Montes, Mariliz)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss by The Town of Oak Bluffs. (Cloherty, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 39 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss by The Town of Oak Bluffs. (Cloherty, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 38 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss by The Town of Oak Bluffs. (Cloherty, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 37 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss by The Town of Oak Bluffs. (Cloherty, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 36 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss by The Town of Oak Bluffs. (Cloherty, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 35 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss by The Town of Oak Bluffs. (Cloherty, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Leave to File Memorandum of 30 Pages ALLOWED by the Court July 31, 2019 filed by The Town of Oak Bluffs. (Cloherty, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 33 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered.The parties shall file a joint statement within fourteen days stating their joint or separate positions as to how Plaintiff intends to proceed in light of the suggestion of death as to Mr. Warren. ( Status Report due by 8/14/2019)(Montes, Mariliz)
July 31, 2019 Filing 32 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Defendant Town of Oak Bluff's Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of 30 pages in Support of its Motion to Dismiss ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 30, 2019 Filing 31 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to George Warren by David Bailey, Mark Barbadoro, Kris Chvatal, Michael Perry, Thomas Perry, Joe Re, Andrea Rogers, Llewellyn Rogers, The Town of Oak Bluffs, George Warren, Robert Whritenour, Peter Yoars. (Cloherty, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Bailey, Mark Barbadoro, Kris Chvatal, Michael Perry, Thomas Perry, Joe Re, Andrea Rogers, Llewellyn Rogers, George Warren, Robert Whritenour, Peter Yoars. (Cloherty, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by David Bailey, Mark Barbadoro, Kris Chvatal, Michael Perry, Thomas Perry, Joe Re, Andrea Rogers, Llewellyn Rogers, George Warren, Robert Whritenour, Peter Yoars.(Cloherty, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of 30 Pages by The Town of Oak Bluffs.(Cloherty, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Town of Oak Bluffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cloherty, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Town of Oak Bluffs.(Cloherty, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Michael Goldsmith answer due 8/30/2019; Ronald Rappaport answer due 8/30/2019; The Law Firm of Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney answer due 8/30/2019. (Simeone, Maria)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (unopposed) by Michael Goldsmith, Ronald Rappaport, The Law Firm of Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney.(Brody, Erica)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L. Brody on behalf of Michael Goldsmith, Ronald Rappaport, The Law Firm of Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney (Brody, Erica)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard H. Kesten on behalf of Michael Goldsmith, Ronald Rappaport, The Law Firm of Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney (Kesten, Leonard)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Barbadoro served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Llewellyn Rogers served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed David Bailey served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrea Rogers served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Goldsmith served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ronald Rappaport served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Law Firm of Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Perry served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Peter Yoars served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed George Warren served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joe Re served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kris Chvatal served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Robert Whritenour served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas Perry served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Town of Oak Bluffs served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(Montes, Mariliz)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Coppola, Katelyn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 1BST074956 for #1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Zarba, Susan Lemoie Zarba.(Coppola, Katelyn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Zarba, Susan Lemoie Zarba. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form, #3 Exhibit)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zarba et al v. The Town of Oak Bluffs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Warren
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Rappaport
Represented By: Erica L. Brody
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Chvatal
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Llewellyn Rogers
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Firm of Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney
Represented By: Erica L. Brody
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Whritenour
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Perry
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bailey
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Yoars
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Barbadoro
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Perry
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goldsmith
Represented By: Erica L. Brody
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Oak Bluffs
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Re
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Rogers
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lemoie Zarba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Zarba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?