Fantastic Sams Franchise Corp. v. Talukders, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation
Defendant: Mrinmoyee Talukder, Talukder1, LLC, Shantanu Talukder, Michelle Scott, Paula Gomez and Talukders Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11369
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE STAY entered. It is hereby ORDERED that the above-entitled action is stayed administratively without prejudice to the right of any party to restore it to the active docket pending resolution of the parallel Arbitration Proceedings. (Lara, Miguel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Thomas A. Mountain (Mountain, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the foregoing reasons, the Court ALLOWS Fantastic Sams' motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. #3 ). Defendants are hereby enjoined from: Using any of Fantastic Sams' trademarks, tradenames, service marks, or logos, or any other trademarks, tradenames, service marks, or logos that are confusingly similar to those marks; Infringing upon Fantastic Sams' trademarks, tradenames, service marks, or logos, or using any similar designation, alone or in combination with any other components; Passing off any products or services as those of authorized Fantastic Sams franchisees or as genuine Fantastic Sams products or services; Causing a likelihood of confusion or misunderstanding as to the source or sponsorship of their business, products, or services; and Causing a likelihood of confusion or misunderstanding as to their affiliation, connection, or association with Fantastic Sams, or with any of its products or services. Defendants are further required to comply with the post-termination covenants in the franchise agreements that require the Franchisees to de-identify as Fantastic Sams franchises by ceasing to use the Fantastic Sams' trademarks, tradenames, service marks, or logos and ceasing to offer and sell Fantastic Sams products. SO ORDERED. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: NO ONE APPEARS FOR THE DEFENSE...Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2019 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation. All matters taken under advisement, court adjourned. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas A. Mountain by Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation. (Mountain, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation. (Mountain, Thomas) (Main Document 14 replaced on 7/19/2019) NEF regenerated as original filing was inaccessible. (Lara, Miguel). (Main Document 14 replaced on 7/19/2019) (Lara, Miguel).
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Michelle Scott Only by Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation. (Mountain, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Fredric A. Cohen and Aaron-Michael Sapp. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form AO 120_2 of 2)(Mountain, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms/Local Forms. Counsel will use the event under Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Report on the Filing of Patent/Trademark Case. (DeMaria, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Fredric A. Cohen, Aaron-Michael Sapp Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7743795 by Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 83.5.3 Certification of Fredric A. Cohen, #2 Exhibit Rule 83.5.3 Certification of Aaron-Michael Sapp)(Mountain, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Mountain on behalf of Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation (Mountain, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance filed by Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation. (Coughlin, Emily)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tiffany Hassell and Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Kathy Speidel and exhibits, #3 Affidavit Declaration of David Holley and Exhibits)(Coughlin, Emily)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (DeMaria, Timothy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7742733 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Form) (Coughlin, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fantastic Sams Franchise Corp. v. Talukders, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrinmoyee Talukder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talukder1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantanu Talukder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talukders Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation
Represented By: Emily G. Coughlin
Represented By: Thomas A. Mountain
Represented By: Aaron-Michael Sapp
Represented By: Fredric A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?