Kelly v. Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shane Kelly
Defendant: Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11398
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 9/17/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order re summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc..(O'Connor, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc. answer due 8/19/2019. (Simeone, Maria)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 19, 2019 to File Answer by Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc..(Connelly, Frederick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Paronich, Anthony)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 9/23/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Washkowitz on behalf of Shane Kelly (Washkowitz, Alex)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7748118 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Shane Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Category Form)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Real Estate Group, Inc.
Represented By: John J. O'Connor
Represented By: Frederick E. Connelly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Kelly
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Alex M. Washkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?