Al Hassan v. Sousa
Petitioner: Adam Al Hassan
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security and Steven Souza
Case Number: 1:2019cv11399
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Mail sent to Adam Al Hassan returned as undeliverable - "Released." (Pacho, Arnold)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Copy re #11 Order Dismissing Case, 10 Order, mailed to Adam Al Hassan on 7/17/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered dismissing case.The United States Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, having effectuated Petitioner Al Hassan's order of removal to Ghana, this case is DISMISSED. (Zierk, Marsha)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of Steven Souza (Balakrishna, Annapurna)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to re #1 Habeas Petition filed by Department of Homeland Security, Steven Souza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE declaration)(Balakrishna, Annapurna) Modified on 7/17/2019 to correct docket text (Pacho, Arnold).
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Al Hassan. (Pacho, Arnold) Modified on 7/15/2019 to delete attachments inadvertently filed in case (Pacho, Arnold).
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. If petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, no later than Wednesday, July 17, 2019, he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. [Order and Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs] mailed to petitioner @ Bristol County HOC on 6/26/2019.] (PSSA, 3)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Steven Souza, superintendent of the Bristol County Jail and House of Correction, shall be substituted as the sole respondent in this action. The respondent shall, no later than Wednesday, July 17, 2019, file a motion for the dismissal or grant of the petition and a memorandum of law in support thereof. [copy of order mailed to petitioner at Bristol County HOC on 6/26/2019; petition and order mailed to respondent on 6/26/2019; petition and order emailed to and hard copy left for US Attorney's Office on 6/26/2019.] (PSSA, 3)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Castilla, Francis)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Adam Al Hassan.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Hassan v. Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam Al Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Souza
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?