Downey v. United States, et al.
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: United States, Gillette Company and Procter & Gamble Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11414
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 19-1768 for #10 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Downey. (Paine, Matthew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #10 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Letter/request (non-motion) regarding sealing case filed by Mark Downey. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order Dismissing Case, #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Mark Downey. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter from COA Clerk's Office) (Pacho, Arnold)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Mark Downey. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. [Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff on 7/1/2019 to address of record: P.O. Drawer SS McLean, VA 022101-0729.] (PSSA, 3)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying #2 Motion to Accommodate the Disabled, Motion to Expedite and Seal, Motion to refer criminal case to US Attorney; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall unseal the docket and all docket entries of this case. This action shall be DISMISSED. [Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff on 7/1/2019 to address of record: P.O. Drawer SS McLean, VA 022101-0729.] (PSSA, 3)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Castilla, Francis)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Accommodate the Disabled, Motion to Expedite and Seal, Motion to refer criminal case to US Attorney by Mark Downey.(Castilla, Francis)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David S Taylor, Mark Leckie, filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement part of complaint, #3 Supplement 2 part of complaint)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. United States, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gillette Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter & Gamble Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?