Palma Gonzalez et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: I.Y. Noj Salazar and C.F. Palma Gonzalez
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan, Mark Morgan and Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv11449
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by I.Y. Noj Salazar, C.F. Palma Gonzalez. (Fuentes, Pamela)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Mark Morgan (Piemonte, Eve)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019. Stand Procedural Order Re: Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 5.2(C) (Danieli, Chris) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct the docket text of the entry (Danieli, Chris).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus & Declaratory Judgement against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7760492 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by I.Y. Noj Salazar, C.F. Palma Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibits in Support of Complaint, #4 Notice of Appearance)(Fuentes, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palma Gonzalez et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.Y. Noj Salazar
Represented By: Pamela E. Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.F. Palma Gonzalez
Represented By: Pamela E. Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?