Anywherecommerce, Inc. et al v. Ingenico, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anywherecommerce, Inc. and BBPOS Limited
Defendant: Ingenico, Inc., Ingenico Ventures SAS, Ingenico Corp. and Ingenico Group, SA
Case Number: 1:2019cv11457
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 58 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand AND INGENICO INC.'S, COUNTERCLAIM against Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited by Ingenico Ventures SAS, Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wray, William)
August 12, 2019 Filing 59 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 8/12/2019. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Court adopted dates in Joint Statement, except for the Interim Fact Discovery Deadlines and Expert Discovery. Answer due 8/15/19. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2019. Admissions due by 3/2/2020. Fact Discovery to be completed by 4/1/2020. Disp. Motions due by 8/31/2020.) Status Conference set for 4/2/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Bozeman, Griffin, Rudolph, Tarantino, Wray) (MacDonald, Gail)
August 5, 2019 Filing 57 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Bozeman, Melissa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 56 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered denying #23 Motion for More Definite Statement. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 1, 2019 Filing 55 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re: Initial Disclosures. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 30, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Initial Disclosures by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico Ventures SAS, Ingenico, Inc.. (Wray, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 53 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #52 Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court to Withdraw Appearance of Gregory Crochet, Esq. filed by BBPOS Limited, Anywherecommerce, Inc. Attorney Gregory R. Crochet terminated. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 26, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court to Withdraw Appearance of Gregory Crochet, Esq. by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited.(Rudolph, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 12:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. PLEASE NOTE CHANGE TO EARLIER TIME. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 17, 2019 Filing 50 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING Assented-to Motion for Leave of Court to Withdraw Appearance #44 . (Kinsella, Devan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 16, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO DOCKET BY COURT STAFF: The clerk has corrected the docket text accompanying Attorney Jonathan D. Friedmann's Notice of Appearance #43 to reflect the fact that counsel is to represent Plaintiffs - not Defendants, as previously entered in error by counsel. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 47 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Peter Nathan Kessler. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 46 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Oliver David Griffin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 45 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Melissa Ann Bozeman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 44 Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lawrence Kunin by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico Ventures SAS, Ingenico, Inc..(Wray, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon D. Friedmann on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Friedmann, Jonathon) Modified on 7/16/2019 to reflect actual parties represented by counsel (Kinsella, Devan).
July 12, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter Nathan Kessler, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7777687 by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification)(Rudolph, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Oliver David Griffin, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7777672 by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification)(Rudolph, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Melissa Ann Bozeman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7777643 by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification)(Rudolph, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Rudolph on behalf of Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited (Rudolph, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
July 3, 2019 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05824.
July 2, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
July 2, 2019 Case transferred electronically to USDC for District of Massachusetts. (dob)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Change Venue to the United States District Fourt for the District of Massachusetts, Boston Division; referring ruling on #23 Motion for More Definite Statement to the assigned transferee judge for adjudication; denying as moot #23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/2/2019. (dob)
June 28, 2019 Filing 35 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) Or MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404;MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(E. (Crochet, Gregory)
April 9, 2019 Submission of #23 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) Or MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404;MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(E, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (dob)
April 9, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) Or MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404;MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(E filed by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc.. (Kunin, Lawrence)
April 8, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) Or MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404;MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(E filed by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. (Crochet, Gregory)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John A Tarantino. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/8/2019. (dob)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Patricia K. Rocha. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/8/2019. (dob)
April 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Patricia K. Rocha Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Patricia K. Rocha added appearing on behalf of Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc. (pmb)
April 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #28 APPLICATION for Admission of John A. Tarantino Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John A. Tarantino added appearing on behalf of Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc. (pmb)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to William K. Wray, Jr.. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/1/2019. (dob)
April 1, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Patricia K. Rocha Pro Hac Vice by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc.. (Kunin, Lawrence)
April 1, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission of John A. Tarantino Pro Hac Vice by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc.. (Kunin, Lawrence)
March 29, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of William K. Wray, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8534201). Attorney William K. Wray, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc. (pmb)
March 29, 2019 RETURN of #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Patricia K. Rocha Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8534176) to attorney for correction. (pmb)
March 29, 2019 RETURN of #25 APPLICATION for Admission of John K. Tarantino Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8534120) to attorney for correction re: petitioner's name. (pmb)
March 26, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) Or MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 ;MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(E. Pleading filed as single part motion; should be multi part motion. Clerk made necessary changes. (dob)
March 25, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of William K. Wray, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8534201)by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc.. (Kunin, Lawrence)
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Patricia K. Rocha Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8534176)by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc.. (Kunin, Lawrence)
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of John K. Tarantino Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8534120)by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc.. (Kunin, Lawrence)
March 25, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) Or Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 And Motion For More Definite Statement Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(E (Declaration of Ward D. Hewins) by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico Ventures SAS, Ingenico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kunin, Lawrence)
March 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); Or Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404; Motion For More Definite Statement Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(E with Brief In Support by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico Ventures SAS, Ingenico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Kunin, Lawrence) . Added MOTION to Change Venue, MOTION for More Definite Statement on 3/26/2019 (dob).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Defendants Ingenico, Inc. and Ingenico Corp.'s #22 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, up to and including 3/25/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/21/2019. (bgt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico, Inc. (Kunin, Lawrence)
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA, Ingenico, Inc. (Kunin, Lawrence)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline by which Defendants Ingenico, Inc. and Ingenico Corp. must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended through and including February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 01/18/2019. (bnp)
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico, Inc. by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico, Inc..(Kunin, Lawrence)
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ingenico Corp., Ingenico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kunin, Lawrence)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Oliver David Griffin. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/17/19. (rlb)
January 17, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Oliver David Griffin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8374506). Attorney Oliver David Griffin added appearing on behalf of Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited (pmb)
January 14, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Melissa Ann Bozeman re #16 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Ann Bozeman. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/14/19. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Nathan Kessler re #15 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter Nathan Kessler. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/14/19. (jpa)
January 11, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter Nathan Kessler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8366682). Attorney Peter Nathan Kessler added appearing on behalf of Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited (pmb)
January 11, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa Ann Bozeman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8366699). Attorney Melissa Ann Bozeman added appearing on behalf of Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited (pmb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ingenico Group, SA and Ingenico Ventures SAS. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ingenico Group, SA)(rlb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited for Ingenico Group, SA (Crochet, Gregory)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited for Ingenico Ventures SAS (Crochet, Gregory)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Oliver David Griffin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8374506)by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. (Crochet, Gregory)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. Ingenico Corp. served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Crochet, Gregory)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. Ingenico, Inc. served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Crochet, Gregory)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa Ann Bozeman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8366699)by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. (Crochet, Gregory)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter Nathan Kessler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8366682)by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. (Crochet, Gregory)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited identifying Corporate Parent BBPOS Holdings Limited for BBPOS Limited; Corporate Parent 4361423 Canada Inc. for Anywherecommerce, Inc.. (Crochet, Gregory)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ingenico Corp., Ingenico Group, SA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ingenico Corp)(bnw)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited to Ingenico Corp. (Crochet, Gregory)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited to Ingenico, Inc. (Crochet, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8343095) filed by Anywherecommerce, Inc., BBPOS Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anywherecommerce, Inc. et al v. Ingenico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anywherecommerce, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Nathan Kessler
Represented By: Oliver D. Griffin
Represented By: Melissa Ann Bozeman
Represented By: Gregory R. Crochet
Represented By: Jonathon D. Friedmann
Represented By: Robert P. Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBPOS Limited
Represented By: Peter Nathan Kessler
Represented By: Oliver D. Griffin
Represented By: Melissa Ann Bozeman
Represented By: Gregory R. Crochet
Represented By: Jonathon D. Friedmann
Represented By: Robert P. Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenico, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Hugh Kunin
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathon D. Friedmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenico Ventures SAS
Represented By: Lawrence Hugh Kunin
Represented By: Jonathon D. Friedmann
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenico Corp.
Represented By: Lawrence Hugh Kunin
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathon D. Friedmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenico Group, SA
Represented By: Lawrence Hugh Kunin
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathon D. Friedmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?