Lu v. Capitol Waste Services, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Friedrich Lu
Defendant: City of Boston, Capitol Waste Services, Inc and Three unknown Boston Police Officer
Case Number: 1:2019cv11458
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Boston, Three unknown Boston Police Officer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Fahey, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Fahey on behalf of Three unknown Boston Police Officer (Fahey, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 32 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #22 Motion for Discovery; denying #27 Motion for Lis Pendens; denying #27 Motion ; denying #28 Motion for Default Judgment; denying #29 Motion for Default Judgment; denying #30 Motion to Amend. (Bono, Christine)
August 23, 2019 Filing 31 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: "GRANTED. Plaintiff is permitted to amend his complaint once as a matter of course within 21 days." ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion to Amend. (Bono, Christine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 30 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REVISE PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Default Judgment as to BPD Officers WITH BADGE NOS 1311, 8930 AND 211 by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Default Judgment as to TRASH HAULER CAPITOL AND ITS EMPLOYEE 1 AND 2 by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S THIRD MOTION ENJOIN CITY FROM TAKING MATTER INTO ITS HAND TO HARASS HIM ( Responses due by 8/28/2019) by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #24 Motion for Recusal; denying #25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Copy mailed.) (Bono, Christine)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Enjoin City From Withholding Service From Him by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Recuse by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 Plaintiff's Motion to File Second Amended Complaint Against John Fahey and Eugene O'Flaherty by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 Request for notice of default against Two Public Works Workers by Friedrich Lu. (Halley, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Updated Copy of Docket mailed to Friedrich Lu on 7/31/2019. (Bono, Christine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #13 Motion for Recusal. (Bono, Christine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of Boston answer due 8/30/2019; Three unknown Boston Police Officer answer due 8/30/2019. (Bono, Christine)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 USCA Case Number 19-1758 for #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Friedrich Lu. (Paine, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 USCA Appeal Fees received $505.00 receipt number 1BST075606 re #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Friedrich Lu (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 6 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Friedrich Lu. ( ) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 8/15/2019. (Halley, Taylor)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Recuse by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Opposition re #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30 2019 to File Answer filed by Friedrich Lu. (Halley, Taylor) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #1 Exhibit) (Halley, Taylor).
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #8 Motion for Reconsideration. (Bono, Christine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30 2019 to File Answer by City of Boston, Three unknown Boston Police Officer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 7.1(a)(2) Communication)(Fahey, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Fahey on behalf of City of Boston (Fahey, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Copy Mailed. (Bono, Christine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST075141 for #1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Preliminary Injuction by Friedrich Lu.(Castilla, Francis) Modified event type on 7/3/2019 (Kinsella, Devan).
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Friedrich Lu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lu v. Capitol Waste Services, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boston
Represented By: John A. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Waste Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three unknown Boston Police Officer
Represented By: John A. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friedrich Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?