Quilty et al v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dennis Quilty and Margaret Quilty
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11460
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Morin, Peter)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Small, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by The Standard Fire Insurance Company.(Small, Jonathan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Varga on behalf of The Standard Fire Insurance Company (Varga, Gregory)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by The Standard Fire Insurance Company.(Small, Jonathan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Answer/Response due July 31, 2019. (Paine, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Standard Fire Insurance Company.(Small, Jonathan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Paine, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Standard Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Standard Fire Insurance Company.. (Small, Jonathan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Standard Fire Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7765071 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 JS45)(Small, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quilty et al v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Quilty
Represented By: Michael W. Ford
Represented By: Peter B. Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Quilty
Represented By: Michael W. Ford
Represented By: Peter B. Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan E. Small
Represented By: Gregory P. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?